Post v. American United Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Lee Post
Defendant: American United Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01309
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by American United Life Insurance Co.. (Chambers, Terran)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Parties' Stipulation to Extend Defendant American United Life Insurance Co.'s Deadline to File Its Answer to First Amended Complaint to June 23, 2020. American United Life Insurance Co. answer due 6/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/9/2020. (JMK)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Chambers, Terran)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer First Amended Complaint by American United Life Insurance Co.. Jointly Signed by Lee Post. (Chambers, Terran)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1309 DSD/HB. (MMG)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American United Life Insurance Co. re #3 Declaration, #2 Notice of Appearance, #4 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Chambers, Terran)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant American United Life Insurance Co., by counsel hereby submits its Corporate Disclosure Statement. American United Life Insurance Co. is wholly owned by OneAmerica Financial Partners, Inc.,(Chambers, Terran) Modified text on 6/4/2020 (MMG).
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Larry E. LaTarte re #1 Notice of Removal, by American United Life Insurance Co. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Chambers, Terran)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Terran C. Chambers on behalf of American United Life Insurance Co.. (Chambers, Terran)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7775646) filed by American United Life Insurance Co.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chambers, Terran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post v. American United Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Post
Represented By: Brian T Rochel
Represented By: Phillip M Kitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American United Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Larry E. LaTarte
Represented By: Terran C. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?