Evens vs C.R. Meyer and Sons Company
Plaintiff: Richard Evens
Defendant: C.R. Meyer and Sons Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv01312
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 STATEMENT OF CASE as to C.R. Meyer and Sons Company. (McDonough, Shannon)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by C.R. Meyer and Sons Company. Jointly Signed by Richard Evens.(McDonough, Shannon)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Richard Evens. (Kramer, Samuel)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Hillary Klein for C.R. Meyer and Sons Company; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Laura Malugade for C.R. Meyer and Sons Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/1/2020. (NAH)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Laura Malugade. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7833137 filed by C.R. Meyer and Sons Company. (Barth, Schaan)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hillary L. Klein. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7833116 filed by C.R. Meyer and Sons Company. (Barth, Schaan)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by C.R. Meyer and Sons Company. (McDonough, Shannon)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-1312 DWF/LIB. (KDS)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. F. M. Pinkerton LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant C.R. Meyer and Sons Company. (McDonough, Shannon)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by C.R. Meyer and Sons Company re #1 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff (McDonough, Shannon)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial District Court of Itasca County, MN, case number 31-cv-20-1110 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7777295) filed by C.R. Meyer and Sons Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (McDonough, Shannon) Modified text on 6/5/2020 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evens vs C.R. Meyer and Sons Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Evens
Represented By: Joshua A Newville
Represented By: Samuel Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Meyer and Sons Company
Represented By: Laura Malugade
Represented By: Schaan Barth
Represented By: Hillary Klein
Represented By: Shannon M McDonough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?