Hansmeier v. Macdonald
Plaintiff: Paul Hansmeier
Defendant: Erica H. Macdonald
Case Number: 0:2020cv01315
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd on 7/29/2020 (MMG).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER - On June 15, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Request to Issue Summons. #3 . On June 16, 2020, the Honorable Leo I. Brisbois issued an Order, 4 , striking as filed in error Plaintiff's Request to Issue Summons. The Court explained that Plaintiff's Request for Summons was premature because Plaintiff's IFP Application, #2 , was still pending. Plaintiff filed an Objection, #5 , to this Court's June 16, 2020, Order. 4 . The Plaintiff's Objection is still pending before the District Judge. Subsequently, Plaintiff was ordered to file additional, requisite information in support of his IFP Application, and he now asserts that he is in the process of obtaining the required information; however, as of the date of this Text Order, he has not yet provided that information to the Court. #16 . Therefore, now, as back on June 16, 2020, Plaintiff's IFP Application, #2 , still remains pending. On July 20, 2020, Plaintiff filed another Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 . Plaintiff's present Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 , is improper because it is merely duplicative of the previous Request to Issue Summons, #3 , which was stricken as procedurally premature, and there has been no substantive change in the procedural posture of the present case since the Plaintiff's Objection #5 to the Court's June 16, 2020, Order striking the initial Request to Issue Summons, as well as his IFP Application both remain pending. Therefore for the foregoing reasons and based on all of the files and records herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERD THAT Plaintiff's Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 , is STRICKEN as filed in error. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/22/2020.(JLB)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 STRICKEN AS FILED IN ERROR per ORDER 18 dated 7/22/2020. REQUEST for issuance of summons by Paul Hansmeier. (kt) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (JLB). Document QC'd on 7/24/2020 (MMG).
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Paul Hansmeier. (kt) Document QC'd on 7/24/2020 (MMG).
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 7/24/2020 (MMG).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER - On July 13, 2020, Plaintiff filed his Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 , and documents in support thereof. #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 . Plaintiff's filings are procedurally improper. As the Court previously informed Plaintiff, his IFP Application, #2 , must be addressed before any other action can be taken in this matter. However, as Plaintiff was also previously informed, his IFP Application, pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act of 1995, cannot be considered until after he pays the initial, partial filing fee in the present case. Order #7 (citing 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)). The Court previously informed Plaintiff that he submitted incomplete financial information for the six months prior to this litigation as required by 1915, and therefore, the amount of his initial, partial filing fee cannot yet be determined. Plaintiff was specifically ordered to submit the required financial information as described in the Court's June 26, 2020, Order. #7 . Plaintiff has not yet done so. After Plaintiff submits the required financial information, the Court will calculate Plaintiff's initial, partial filing fee, and Plaintiff will be permitted a reasonable time to pay that initial, partial filing fee. After Plaintiff pays that initial, partial filing fee, the Court will review Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to the 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). It is not until the completion of that process that the Court will entertain any motion from Plaintiff beyond those related to his IFP Application. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 ; his memorandum in support thereof, #9 ; his declaration, #10 ; his proposed order, #11 ; and his certificate of service, #12 , are each stricken without prejudice as filed in error. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/14/2020. (JLB)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Brisbois Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 7/14/2020.(KMW)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS FILED IN ERROR PER ORDER, Docket No. 14, dated 7/14/2020. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Hansmeier re #11 Proposed Order to Judge, #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, #10 Declaration in Support (kt) Modified text on 7/14/2020 (JLB). Document QC'd on 7/30/2020 (JGK).
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS FILED IN ERROR PER ORDER, Docket No. 14, dated 7/14/2020. PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Paul Hansmeier.(kt) Modified text on 7/14/2020 (JLB). Document QC'd on 7/30/2020 (JGK).
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS FILED IN ERROR PER ORDER, Docket No. 14, dated 7/14/2020. Declaration of Paul Hansmeier in Support of #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Paul Hansmeier.(kt) Modified text on 7/14/2020 (JLB). Document QC'd on 7/30/2020 (JGK).
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS FILED IN ERROR PER ORDER, Docket No. 14, dated 7/14/2020. MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Paul Hansmeier.(kt) Modified text on 7/14/2020 (JLB). Document QC'd on 7/30/2020 (JGK).
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS FILED IN ERROR PER ORDER, Docket No. 14, dated 7/14/2020. MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Modified text on 7/14/2020 (JLB). Document QC'd on 7/30/2020 (JGK).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Paul Hansmeier. 1. Plaintiff must submit the required financial information (as described above) within thirty (30) days, failing which it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute; and 2. The Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff a copy of this District's IFP application, including a certificate of financial information for prison officials to complete on Plaintiff's behalf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/26/2020.(JLB)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against William Barr, Erica Macdonald filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kt) Document QC'd on 7/15/2020 (MMG).
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 4 Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail, filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd on 7/28/2020 (MMG).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text-Only) ORDER - On June 15, 2020, the plaintiff filed a Request to Issue Summons #3 . Based upon review of the files, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Request for Issuance of Summons #3 is STRICKEN FILED IN ERROR, as premature, pending a decision on plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs #2 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/16/2020.(JLB)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 STRICKEN - FILED IN ERROR per 4 ORDER filed 6/16/2020. REQUEST TO ISSUE SUMMONS filed by Paul Hansmeier. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (JLB).
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Paul Hansmeier. (JGK) Document QC'd on 6/9/2020 (MMG).
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Erica H. Macdonald filed by Paul Hansmeier. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 5th Civil Rights - Housing/Accomindations & ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 6/9/2020 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansmeier v. Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hansmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica H. Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?