Warsame v. Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Noridin Warsame
Defendant: Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01318
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sara Welch Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc.; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kyle Malone for Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/2/2020. (NAH)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Anne Marie Buethe as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle W. Malone. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7840483 filed by Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc.. (Parker, Kristin)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sara E. Welch. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7840477 filed by Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc.. (Parker, Kristin)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc.. (Parker, Kristin)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc.. (Parker, Kristin)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Noridin Warsame of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fisher, Michele)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Noridin Warsame of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fisher, Michele)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Noridin Warsame of Consent Filing (Attachments: #1 Consent (1))(Fisher, Michele)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noridin Warsame. Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc. served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Fisher, Michele)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc. (MMP)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1318 (ECT/ECW). (MMP)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7778886) filed by Noridin Warsame. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (Consent), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fisher, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warsame v. Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noridin Warsame
Represented By: Michele R Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transportation Network, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Malone
Represented By: Sara Welch
Represented By: Kristin Berger Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?