Tirado v. City of Minneapolis et al
Plaintiff: Linda Tirado
Defendant: John Harrington, John Does, Robert Kroll, Medaria Arrandondo, Matthew Langer and City of Minneapolis
Case Number: 0:2020cv01338
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gaelle Tribie for Linda Tirado; granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gabriel Schonfeld for Linda Tirado. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/31/2020. (NAH)
July 29, 2020 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Medaria Arrandondo, City of Minneapolis, John Does, John Harrington, Robert Kroll, Matthew Langer. filed by Linda Tirado. No summons requested. (Baker, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Clifford M. Greene (Baker, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gabriel Isaac Schonfeld. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924276 filed by Linda Tirado. (Baker, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gaelle Emilie Tribie. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7924260 filed by Linda Tirado. (Baker, John)
July 16, 2020 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #25 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Passe, Julianna)
July 16, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by John Harrington, Matthew Langer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Passe, Julianna)
July 16, 2020 Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #25 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by John Harrington, Matthew Langer.(Passe, Julianna)
July 16, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #25 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Passe, Julianna)
July 16, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by John Harrington, Matthew Langer. (Passe, Julianna)
July 9, 2020 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Robert Kroll.(Kelly, Joseph)
July 9, 2020 Filing 23 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Chief Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Chief Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. (HAZ)
July 8, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Robert Kroll.(Kelly, Joseph)
July 8, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Kelly in SUPPORT OF #19 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Robert Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2)(Kelly, Joseph)
July 8, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Robert Kroll. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kelly, Joseph)
July 8, 2020 Filing 19 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Robert Kroll. (Kelly, Joseph)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on #15 Stipulation. John Harrington response due 7/20/2020; Matthew Langer response due 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/1/2020.(TMA)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharda R Enslin on behalf of Medaria Arrandondo, City of Minneapolis. (Enslin, Sharda)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Passe, Julianna)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION toExtend State DEF Time to Respond to PL Complaint by John Harrington, Matthew Langer. Jointly signed by Plaintiff. (Passe, Julianna) Modified text on 6/26/2020 (kt).
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Tirado. Robert Kroll served on 6/17/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (Baker, John)
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Tirado. Medaria Arrandondo waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Baker, John)
June 24, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Tirado. City of Minneapolis waiver sent on 6/17/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Baker, John)
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linda Tirado (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Baker, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Kelly on behalf of Robert Kroll. (Kelly, Joseph)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Iverson Landrum on behalf of John Harrington, Matthew Langer. (Landrum, Kathryn)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Margaret Allen for Linda Tirado; granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patricia Butler for Linda Tirado; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tai-Heng Cheng for Linda Tirado; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kierstin S. Fowler for Linda Tirado. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/16/2020. (NAH)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Medaria Arrandondo, City of Minneapolis, John Does, John Harrington, Robert Kroll, Matthew Langer. (MMP)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd 4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1338 (JRT/ECW). (MMP)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kiersten S. Fowler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7789354 filed by Linda Tirado. (Baker, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tai-Heng Cheng. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7789348 filed by Linda Tirado. (Baker, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patricia Butler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7789337 filed by Linda Tirado. (Baker, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margaret H. Allen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7789287 filed by Linda Tirado. (Baker, John)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medaria Arrandondo, City of Minneapolis, John Does 1-4, John Harrington, Robert Kroll, Matthew Langer (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7789255) filed by Linda Tirado. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tirado v. City of Minneapolis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medaria Arrandondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Langer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minneapolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Tirado
Represented By: John M Baker
Represented By: Davida Sheri McGhee
Represented By: Clifford M Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?