BAM Navigation, LLC v. Wells Fargo & Co. et al
Plaintiff: BAM Navigation, LLC
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A. and Wells Fargo & Co.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01345
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is owned 100% by WFC Holdings, LLC. (Thomson, Richard) Modified text on 6/29/2020 (KDS).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER on #15 Stipulation. Wells Fargo & Co. answer or otherwise respond due date: 9/4/2020; Wells Fargo Bank N.A. answer or otherwise respond due date 9/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/25/2020.(TMA)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge John R. Tunheim recused. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1345 (NEB/ECW). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/24/2020. (lmb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M Williams on behalf of BAM Navigation, LLC. (Williams, Amanda)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO ANSWER, PLEAD, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. (Schwartz, Amy)
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHEWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Schwartz, Amy)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T Thomson on behalf of Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Thomson, Richard)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L Schwartz on behalf of Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Schwartz, Amy)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenneth A Wexler for BAM Navigation, LLC; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bethany Turke for BAM Navigation, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/17/2020. (NAH)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BAM Navigation, LLC. Wells Fargo & Co. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Wells Fargo Bank N.A. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Gustafson, Daniel)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bethany R. Turke. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7799532 filed by BAM Navigation, LLC. (Borrelli, Raina)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7799506 filed by BAM Navigation, LLC. (Borrelli, Raina)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Simon Bahne Paris for BAM Navigation, LLC.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick Howard for BAM Navigation, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/12/2020. (JGK)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick Howard. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7793484 filed by BAM Navigation, LLC. (Borrelli, Raina)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Simon B. Paris. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7793467 filed by BAM Navigation, LLC. (Borrelli, Raina)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kenneth A. Wexler, Bethany R. Turke, Simon B. Paris, Patrick Howard as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (kt)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1345 JRT/ECW. (kt)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff BAM Navigation, LLC. (Gustafson, Daniel)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7791663) filed by BAM Navigation, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustafson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAM Navigation, LLC v. Wells Fargo & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Richard T Thomson
Represented By: Amy L Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: Richard T Thomson
Represented By: Amy L Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAM Navigation, LLC
Represented By: Raina Borrelli
Represented By: Mickey L Stevens
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Simon Bahne Paris
Represented By: Kenneth A Wexler
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Patrick Howard
Represented By: Bethany Turke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?