Wagner v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Sharon Wagner
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 0:2020cv01348
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Stipulation Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company's answer is due 8/31/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/5/2020.(KAT)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Moen, Brian)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Defendant's Extension of Time to Respond by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. Jointly Signed by Sharon Wagner. (Moen, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sharon Wagner. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The waiver sent on 6/12/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (Kramer, Patrick)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (MMP)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1348 (SRN/KMM). (MMP)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7792171) filed by Sharon Wagner. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kramer, Patrick) Modified text on 6/11/2020 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Brian Moen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Wagner
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Represented By: Patrick Ward Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?