Moose Lake Motel, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Moose Lake Motel, Inc.
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv01362
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 7/1/2021. Motions (disp) due by 8/1/2021. Ready for trial due by 11/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/4/2020.(JLB)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Owners Insurance Company. (Tobin, Timothy)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Moose Lake Motel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hammond, Bradley) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (CLK).
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Moose Lake Motel, Inc..(Hammond, Bradley)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Moose Lake Motel, Inc.. (Hammond, Bradley)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley K Hammond on behalf of Moose Lake Motel, Inc.. (Hammond, Bradley)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Owners Insurance Company re #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #1 Notice of Removal, (Tobin, Timothy)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-1362 JRT/LIB. (KDS)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Tobin, Timothy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carlton County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7797349) filed by Owners Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Answer, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4Civil Cover Sheet) (Tobin, Timothy) Modified text on 6/15/2020 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moose Lake Motel, Inc. v. Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy P Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moose Lake Motel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?