Bell v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: NICOLAS BELL
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv01393
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a letter on or before 8/14/2020 advising the Court that he has mailed a petition for reinstatement to the Clerk of Court along with the miscellaneous filing fee. In the same letter, Plaintiff's counsel shall further advise the Court whether he currently receives electronic notifications and other correspondence at the email address on file with the Clerk, and if he does not, he must provide an active email address that he regularly reviews. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/3/2020.(BJP)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT Joint Rule 26(f) by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas A.P. Hayden for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/20/2020. (NAH)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas A. P. Hayden. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7890495 filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Gendreau, Dan)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company.(Privert, Sarah Joel)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) Affidavit)(Privert, Sarah Joel)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Privert, Sarah Joel)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dan J Gendreau on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gendreau, Dan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Union Pacific Railroad Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Joel Martine Privert on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Privert, Sarah Joel)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SEEKING 26(f) REPORT: Rule 26 Meeting Report and confidential letters due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/19/2020.(KAT)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1393 WMW/KMM. (CLK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 10th Judicial District, Anoka County, MN, case number 02-CV-20-2642 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7812162) filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 Summons and Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Privert, Sarah Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Sarah Joel Martine Privert
Represented By: Thomas A.P. Hayden
Represented By: Dan J Gendreau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLAS BELL
Represented By: Jeremy L Brantingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?