Laabs v. Nor-Son, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Laabs
Defendant: Nor-Son, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01399
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings /Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7D (STP) before Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (Erickson, Kurt)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings /Summary Judgment filed by Nor-Son, Inc.. (Erickson, Kurt)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/17/2020. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Nor-Son, Inc.. (Erickson, Kurt)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 7/8/2020. Filed Wednesday, July 22, 2020.(LLM) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (MMP).
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nor-Son, Inc.. (Trang, Minhquang)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Laabs. Nor-Son, Inc. served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (May, Nicholas)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nor-Son, Inc.. (MMG)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1399 PAM/ECW. (MMG)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nor-Son, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7809082) filed by Brian Laabs. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (May, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laabs v. Nor-Son, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nor-Son, Inc.
Represented By: Minhquang Trang
Represented By: Kurt J Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Laabs
Represented By: Nicholas G B May
Represented By: David H Redden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?