R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company et al v. City of Edina et al
Plaintiff: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Lang's Automotive Service Inc. dba Lang's One Stop Market, Cousins II Inc. dba Vernon BP, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, American Snuff Company, LLC, Lang's Automotive Service Inc. doing business as Lang's One Stop Market and Cousins II Inc. doing business as Vernon BP
Defendant: Scott Neal, City of Edina and Edina City Council
Case Number: 0:2020cv01402
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 44 Reply to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by City of Edina, Edina City Council, Scott Neal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Kendall, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE: Remote Public Access to Motion Hearing on 8/20/2020 at 8:30 AM. To obtain the dial-in instructions, contact Caryn Glover at caryn_glover@mnd.uscourts.gov (CLG)
August 10, 2020 Filing 42 (Text-Only) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6), #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 at 08:30 AM via Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. Instructions will be emailed directly to the parties.(CLG)
August 6, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) and Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Beane, Lisa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Shana Nicole Conklin on behalf of All Defendants. (Conklin, Shana)
July 23, 2020 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by City of Edina, Edina City Council, Scott Neal.(Kendall, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 38 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #34 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by City of Edina, Edina City Council, Scott Neal.(Kendall, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 37 First AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer Garske in SUPPORT OF #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) Affidavit of Jennifer Garske in Support of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by City of Edina, Edina City Council, Scott Neal.(Kendall, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support re #34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) Memo in Support of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Edina, Edina City Council, Scott Neal.(Kendall, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION Notice of Hearing on Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Kendall, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss/General Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by City of Edina, Edina City Council, Scott Neal. (Kendall, David)
July 9, 2020 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc..(Beane, Lisa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 32 Declaration of Mark Lee Olson in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc..(Beane, Lisa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 31 Declaration of Lamar W. Huckabee in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc..(Beane, Lisa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 30 Declaration of Christy Canary-Garner in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc..(Beane, Lisa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 29 Declaration of Anita Dianne Lang in Support of #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc..(Beane, Lisa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Addendum)(Beane, Lisa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc..(Beane, Lisa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Beane, Lisa)
July 9, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Beane, Lisa)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 BRIEFING ORDER on #22 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/9/2020.(CLG)
July 8, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 Stipulation,. (Beane, Lisa)
July 8, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION to Establish Briefing Schedule on Motions for Preliminary Injunction and to Dismiss by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. Jointly Signed by City of Edina, Edina City Council, and Scott Neal in his official capacity as City Manager of the City of Edina. (Beane, Lisa)
July 7, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by David Kendall on behalf of All Defendants. (Kendall, David)
June 24, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lang's Automotive Service Inc., American Snuff Company, LLC, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., Cousins II Inc.. Scott Neal served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Beane, Lisa)
June 24, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lang's Automotive Service Inc., American Snuff Company, LLC, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., Cousins II Inc.. Edina City Council served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Beane, Lisa)
June 24, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lang's Automotive Service Inc., American Snuff Company, LLC, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., Cousins II Inc.. City of Edina served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Beane, Lisa)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Return of Service Executed for Summons & Complaint served on Scott Neal, in his official capacity, City Manager-Edina on 06/18/2020, filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Beane, Lisa) Modified text on 6/24/2020 (CLK).
June 23, 2020 Filing 16 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Return of Service Executed for Summons & Complaint served on Edina City Council on 06/18/2020, filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Beane, Lisa) Modified text on 6/24/2020 (CLK).
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Return of Service Executed for Summons & Complaint served on City of Edina on 06/18/2020, filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Beane, Lisa) Modified text on 6/24/2020 (CLK).
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christian Vergonis for American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, and for Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ryan Jeffrey Watson for American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, and for Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/19/2020. (NAH)
June 18, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Lang's Automotive Service Inc.. (Beane, Lisa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Cousins II Inc.. (Beane, Lisa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company is a direct, wholly owned subsidiary of Reynolds American Inc.; and Reynolds American Inc. is an indirect, wholly owned subsidiary of British American Tobacco, p.l.c., a publicly traded company is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Beane, Lisa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. American Snuff Company, LLC is a direct, wholly owned subsidiary of Conwood Holdings, Inc.; Conwood Holdings, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of Reynolds American Inc.; and Reynolds American Inc. is an indirect, wholly owned subsidiary of British American Tobacco, p.l.c., a publicly traded company is a corporate parent of Plaintiff American Snuff Company, LLC. (Beane, Lisa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company is a direct, wholly owned subsidiary of RAI Innovations Company; RAI Innovations Company is a direct, wholly owned subsidiary of Reynolds American Inc.; and Reynolds American Inc. is an indirect, wholly owned subsidiary of British American Tobacco, p.l.c., a publicly traded company is a corporate parent of Plaintiff R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company. (Beane, Lisa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company is a direct, wholly owned subsidiary of R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Holdings, Inc.; R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Holdings, Inc. is a direct, wholly owned subsidiary of Reynolds American Inc.; and Reynolds American Inc. is an indirect, wholly owned subsidiary of British American Tobacco, p.l.c., a publicly traded company is a corporate parent of Plaintiff R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. (Beane, Lisa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ryan J. Watson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7811535 filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Beane, Lisa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christian G. Vergonis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7811431 filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Beane, Lisa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for American Snuff Company, LLC, Cousins II Inc., Lang's Automotive Service Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Beane, Lisa)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Christian G. Vergonis, Ryan J. Watson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KDS)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Edina, Edina City Council, Scott Neal. (KDS)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-1402 PJS/LIB. (KDS)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Edina, Edina City Council, Scott Neal (filing fee $ 400, receipt number CMNDC-7810178) filed by Lang's Automotive Service Inc. dba Lang's One Stop Market, American Snuff Company, LLC, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., Cousins II Inc. dba Vernon BP. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beane, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company et al v. City of Edina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Neal
Represented By: Shana Nicole Conklin
Represented By: David Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Edina
Represented By: Shana Nicole Conklin
Represented By: David Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edina City Council
Represented By: Shana Nicole Conklin
Represented By: David Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lang's Automotive Service Inc. dba Lang's One Stop Market
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cousins II Inc. dba Vernon BP
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Snuff Company, LLC
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lang's Automotive Service Inc. doing business as Lang's One Stop Market
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cousins II Inc. doing business as Vernon BP
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?