Roland v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Plaintiff: Jenna Roland
Defendant: Toyota Financial Services, John Doe Repossession Agency and Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Case Number: 0:2020cv01406
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint Toyota Motor Credit Corporation response due 8/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/31/2020. (TMA)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Dalton, Margaret)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint filed by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Dalton, Margaret)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenna Roland. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (Lyons, Thomas)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to John Doe Repossession Agency, Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (CLK)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against John Doe Repossession Agency, Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. filed by Jenna Roland. Filer requests summons issued. (Lyons, Thomas)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Doe Repossession Agency, Toyota Financial Services. (MMG)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1406 JRT/ECW. (MMG)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Toyota Financial Services (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7812523) filed by Jenna Roland. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roland v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Repossession Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Represented By: Margaret E Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Roland
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?