F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC et al v. Cuningham Group Architecture, Inc.
Plaintiff: F&C Berkley Park, LLC and F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC
Defendant: Cunningham Group Architecture, Inc. and Cuningham Group Architecture, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01422
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MKB)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 8/14/2020. (RJE)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Forsgren, Matthew)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC, F&C Berkley Park, LLC. Jointly Signed by F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC, F&C Berkley Park, LLC, and Cuningham Group Architecture, Inc.. (Forsgren, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/2/2020. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Cuningham Group Architecture, Inc.. (Hutchens, Michael)
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Cuningham Group Architecture, Inc. (CLK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy Kolaya for F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC and for F&C Berkley Park, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/22/2020. (NAH)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1422 WMW/ECW. (KDS)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Timothy A. Kolaya re #1 Complaint, by F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC, F&C Berkley Park, LLC . (Forsgren, Matthew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy A. Kolaya. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7816714 filed by F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC, F&C Berkley Park, LLC. (Forsgren, Matthew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Berkley Park, LLC is a corporate parent of Plaintiffs F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC, F&C Berkley Park, LLC. F&C Berkley Park, LLC is a corporate parent of Plaintiffs F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC, F&C Berkley Park, LLC. (Forsgren, Matthew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cunningham Group Architecture, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7816433) filed by F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC, F&C Berkley Park, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Forsgren, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC et al v. Cuningham Group Architecture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cunningham Group Architecture, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuningham Group Architecture, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Hutchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F&C Berkley Park, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D Forsgren
Represented By: Timothy Kolaya
Represented By: Davida Sheri McGhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F&C Berkley Park KC, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D Forsgren
Represented By: Timothy Kolaya
Represented By: Davida Sheri McGhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?