Taylor et al v. LoanCare, LLC
Plaintiff: Theresa M. Pfingsten and Janis M. Taylor
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01448
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint With Affirmative Defenses filed by LoanCare, LLC. (Newman, Patrick)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER on #5 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. LoanCare, LLC answer due 8/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/22/2020.(KAT)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #5 Stipulation. (Newman, Patrick)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by LoanCare, LLC. Jointly Signed by Janis M. Taylor and Theresa M. Pfingsten. (Newman, Patrick)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant LoanCare, LLC. (Newman, Patrick)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LoanCare, LLC. (MMP)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1448 (PJS/KMM). (MMP)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against LoanCare, LLC, a ServiceLink Company on behalf of Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7826104) filed by Janis M Taylor, Theresa M Pfingsten. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. LoanCare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa M. Pfingsten
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis M. Taylor
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Represented By: Patrick D Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?