Swenson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Annastina Swenson
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Roundbank
Case Number: 0:2020cv01449
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 9/29/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB)
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant Roundbank's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Roundbank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C) (Rose, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiff and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Annastina Swenson (Chester, Anthony)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Roundbank. (Rose, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - DISCLOSURES ROUNDBANKS RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Rose, Steven) Modified text on 7/1/2020 (MMP).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/29/2020; Roundbank answer due 7/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/30/2020.(TJB) Modified text on 6/30/2020 (TJB).
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven V. Rose on behalf of All Defendants. (Rose, Steven)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Callie Barr for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/24/2020. (NAH)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Annastina Swenson and Roundbank. (Myers, Gregory)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1449 (DSD/DTS). (MMP)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Callie Barr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7826238, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Myers, Gregory)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Callie Barr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7826238 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Experian PLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. The following companies are the US-based subsidiaries of Experian PLC that are not wholly owned:(a) Central Source LLC, (b) Online Data Exchange LLC, (c) New Management Services LLC, (d) VantageScore Solutions LLC, (e) Opt-Out Services LLC, Experian PLC owns 100 percent of Experian. Experian PLC is a Jersey, Channel Islands company which is publicly traded on the London Stock Exchange. (Myers, Gregory) Modified text on 6/24/2020 (MMP).
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rice County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7826186) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Consent Form Roundbank, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Myers, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swenson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annastina Swenson
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Callie Barr
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roundbank
Represented By: Steven V. Rose
Represented By: Nathan W Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?