Glinski v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Leonard Glinski
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01458
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Toyota Motor Credit Corporation answer due 8/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/4/2020. (TJB)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Dalton, Margaret)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (Dalton, Margaret)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 8/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/31/2020. (TJB)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Hoglund, Lauren)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance with attached Certificate of Service by Robert J Hoglund on behalf of Leonard Glinski. (Hoglund, Robert) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (MMP).
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonard Glinski. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Hoglund, Robert)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonard Glinski. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 7/13/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Hoglund, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. (MMP)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1458 (PJS/DTS). (MMP)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Mark Weimerskirch on behalf of Leonard Glinski. (Weimerskirch, Douglas)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Toyota Motor Credit Corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7830409) filed by Leonard Glinski. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weimerskirch, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glinski v. Toyota Motor Credit Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Credit Corporation
Represented By: Margaret E Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Glinski
Represented By: Douglas Mark Weimerskirch
Represented By: Robert J Hoglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?