Innovative Vending Solutions, LLC v. Smarte Carte Inc.
Plaintiff: Innovative Vending Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Smarte Carte Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01461
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT ON DETERMINATION OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing.) (kt)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Innovative Vending Solutions, LLC (Toft, Lukas)
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Innovative Vending Solutions, LLC. Smarte Carte Inc. waiver sent on 6/25/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Toft, Lukas)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Toft, Lukas)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Smarte Carte Inc. (MMP)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd 4th Patent List, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1461 (NEB/HB) (MMP)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Innovative Vending Solutions, LLC. (Toft, Lukas)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smarte Carte Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7831160) filed by Innovative Vending Solutions, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Toft, Lukas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Vending Solutions, LLC v. Smarte Carte Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smarte Carte Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Vending Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Lukas Dustin Jonathon Toft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?