Sleep Number Corporation v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Sleep Number Corporation
Defendant: Steven Jay Young, Carl Hewitt and UDP Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01507
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #40 Exhibit, #35 Declaration in Opposition, #32 Declaration in Opposition, #58 Declaration in Support, #56 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #61 Declaration in Support, #30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Weber, Lauren)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 8/17/2020 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (61 pages). Court Reporter: Lynne Krenz. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Transcript temporarily sealed to determine if redactions are required. Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction or Notice that No Redaction is Required. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 8/27/2020. Redaction Request due 9/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2020. (LMK)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #68 Order on Motion to Seal Document,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Expert,,, Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Hashmall, David)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: denying #3 Motion to Seal #1 Complaint; and denying #13 Plaintiffs Motion for Order Preserving Evidence, Authorizing Expedited Discovery and Appointing Computer Forensics Expert. Motion Hearing held on 8/17/2020 re #13 Plaintiffs Motion for Order Preserving Evidence, Authorizing Expedited Discovery and Appointing Computer Forensics Expert, and #3 Plaintiff's MOTION to SEAL #1 Complaint. (Court Reporter Lynn Krenz) (SGK)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE: Remote Public Access to #55 Motion Hearing on 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM.To join the telephonic hearing, dial 1-669-254-5252. Use access code 160 836 2759 and security code 748681307. Attorneys of record on the case will be sent a Zoom Invite to the hearing. (KMW)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #54 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #54 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Declaration of Rachel M. Walsh in Support of #54 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G)(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #61 Sealed Document(s) - [61-1] Sealed Exhibit C filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Redacted Document for #61 Sealed Declaration of Carl Hewitt filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SEALED Declaration of Carl Hewitt in Support of #54 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steven Jay Young; Carl Hewitt; UDP Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit C)(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #58 Sealed Document(s) - [58-1] Sealed Ex. C filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Redacted Document for #58 Sealed Declaration of Steven Young filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SEALED Declaration of Steven Young in Support of #54 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steven Jay Young; Carl Hewitt; UDP Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit C)(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Redacted Document for #56 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #54 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steven Jay Young; Carl Hewitt; UDP Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #54 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Hashmall, David)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #52 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. Defendant's request to exceed the word count limit for motions to be filed in this case today, is DENIED. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 8/12/2020.(KMW)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits filed by Defendants. (Walsh, Rachel) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (kt).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Declaration of Lisa Eull in Support of #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation.(Toft, Lukas)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Declaration of Dawn Weiss in Support of #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Toft, Lukas)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Supplemental Declaration of Michael Wu in Support of #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Toft, Lukas)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY re #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Toft, Lukas)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #43 This case is before the Court on Plaintiffs request to file a 4-page reply brief (Dkt. 43). The motion is GRANTED and Plaintiff shall file a reply of no more than 4 pages on or before August 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/10/2020. (TMA)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply filed by Sleep Number Corporation.(Toft, Lukas)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Declaration of Lukas Toft in Support of #43 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Toft, Lukas)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Toft, Lukas)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Toft, Lukas)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DECLARATION of Omid Sayadi in Opposition to #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Redacted Document for #40 Sealed Exhibit A to the Declaration of Eric Hewitt filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit A to Declaration of Eric Hewitt re #39 Declaration in Opposition, filed by Steven Jay Young; Carl Hewitt; UDP Labs, Inc..(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Eric Hewitt in Opposition to #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B, #2 Exhibit(s) C)(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #35 Sealed Document(s) - [35-1] Sealed Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Hewitt filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Redacted Document for #35 Sealed Declaration of Carl Hewitt filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 EXHIBIT B to Declaration of Carl Hewitt re #35 Declaration in Opposition, filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (MMP).
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SEALED DECLARATION of Carl Hewitt in Opposition to #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Steven Jay Young; Carl Hewitt; UDP Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #32 Sealed Document(s) - [32-1] Sealed Exhibit A filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Redacted Document for #32 Sealed Declaration of Steven Young filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SEALED DECLARATION of Steven Young in Opposition to #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Steven Jay Young; Carl Hewitt; UDP Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Redacted Document for #30 Sealed Memorandum in Opposition to Sleep Number's Motion for Order Preserving Evidence, Authorizing Expedited Discovery, and Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young.(Hashmall, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Steven Jay Young; Carl Hewitt; UDP Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hashmall, David)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued for Carl Hewitt Acknowledgement filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Toft, Lukas)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER in Response to #12 and #26 Letters to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/21/2020.(SGK)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rachel M. Walsh for Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., and for Steven Jay Young; granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Lin for Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., and for Steven Jay Young; granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Indra Neel Chatterjee for Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., and for Steven Jay Young. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/21/2020. (NAH)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sleep Number Corporation . (Toft, Lukas)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert : Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2020 at 09:00 AM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Toft, Lukas)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James Lin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7894570 filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Hashmall, David)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rachel M. Walsh. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7894531 filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Hashmall, David)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Neel Chatterjee. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7894459 filed by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Hashmall, David)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence, MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery, MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation.(Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence, MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery, MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation.(Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Declaration of Michael Wu in Support of #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence, MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery, MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation.(Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Declaration of Lukas Toft in Support of #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence, MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery, MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration of Lucas Woodland in Support of #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence, MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery, MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Declaration of Annie Bloomquist in Support of #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence, MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery, MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Declaration of Dennis Hansen in Support of #13 MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence, MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery, MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence, MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery, MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order Preserving Evidence, MOTION Authorizing Expedited Discovery, MOTION Appointing Computer Forensics Expert filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP). Modified text on 7/20/2020 (MTP).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young . (Hashmall, David)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (Hashmall, David)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Hashmall on behalf of All Defendants. (Hashmall, David)
July 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sleep Number Corporation. Steven Jay Young served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. (Toft, Lukas)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie I. Uhlemann on behalf of Sleep Number Corporation. (Uhlemann, Natalie)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sleep Number Corporation. UDP Labs, Inc. served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. (Toft, Lukas)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carl Hewitt, UDP Labs, Inc., Steven Jay Young. (CLK)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1507 NEB/ECW. (CLK)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Sleep Number Corporation. (Toft, Lukas)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to SEAL #1 Complaint, filed by Sleep Number Corporation. (Toft, Lukas)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Redacted Document for #1 Sealed Complaint . (Toft, Lukas)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Unsealed 08/17/2020) against UDP Labs, Inc., Carl Hewitt, Steven Jay Young (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7850900) filed by Sleep Number Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Toft, Lukas) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sleep Number Corporation v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Jay Young
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: James Lin
Represented By: David L Hashmall
Represented By: Lauren M. Weber
Represented By: Rachel M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Hewitt
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: James Lin
Represented By: David L Hashmall
Represented By: Lauren M. Weber
Represented By: Rachel M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UDP Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon J. Wheeler
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: James Lin
Represented By: David L Hashmall
Represented By: Lauren M. Weber
Represented By: Rachel M. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sleep Number Corporation
Represented By: Lukas Dustin Jonathon Toft
Represented By: Randall J Pattee
Represented By: Andrew S Hansen
Represented By: Natalie I. Uhlemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?