Keller v. Trans Union LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Keller
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01595
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/22/2020. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2020 at 12:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 JUDGMENT as to Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(lmb)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING PARTY Bank of America, pursuant to #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/14/2020. (SMD)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jimmy Keller (Chester, Anthony)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. (Gilbert, Ronald)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Bank of America, N.A. response due 8/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/23/2020.(TMA)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. The non-governmental corporate party, Bank of America, N.A. is wholly owned by BAC North America Holding Company. (Schroeder, Mark) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (KDS).
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Schroeder, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION For Extension of Time for Bank of America, N.A. to Respond to Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Jimmy Keller. (Schroeder, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ronald C. Gilbert, III for Trans Union LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/22/2020. (NAH)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald C. Gilbert, III. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7899372 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Trans Union LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. (Fisher, Bradley) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (KDS).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1595 SRN/ECW. (kt)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Chippewa County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7890436) filed by Trans Union LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Consent from Bank of America, N.A., #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service) (Fisher, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Fisher
Represented By: Amy M Sieben
Represented By: Ronald C. Gilbert, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Keller
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?