Uptime Systems, LLC v. Kennard Law, P.C.
Plaintiff: Upline Systems, LLC and Uptime Systems, LLC
Defendant: Kennard Law, P.C.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01597
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Motion Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Amend is reset for 10/26/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/8/2020.(TMA)
September 4, 2020 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kennard Law, P.C..(Kennard, Alfonso)
September 4, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kennard, Alfonso)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Amend is set for 10/15/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright via videoconference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/4/2020.(TMA)
August 31, 2020 Filing 28 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #26 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Kennard Law, P.C..(Kennard, Alfonso)
August 31, 2020 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Motion to Amend Answer #26 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. (Kennard, Alfonso)
August 31, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Kennard, Alfonso)
August 29, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Uptime Systems, LLC re #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Cerny, Steven)
August 29, 2020 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Uptime Systems, LLC.(Cerny, Steven)
August 29, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Revoke Pro Hac Vice Status of Alfonso Kennard, Jr. filed by Uptime Systems, LLC.(Cerny, Steven)
August 29, 2020 Filing 22 Declaration of Steven M. Cerny in Support of #19 MOTION to Revoke Pro Hac Vice Status of Alfonso Kennard, Jr. filed by Uptime Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cerny, Steven)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Revoke Pro Hac Vice Status of Alfonso Kennard, Jr. filed by Uptime Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cerny, Steven)
August 27, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #19 MOTION to Revoke Pro Hac Vice Status of Alfonso Kennard, Jr. : Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2020 at 01:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Cerny, Steven)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Revoke Pro Hac Vice Status of Alfonso Kennard, Jr. filed by Uptime Systems, LLC. (Cerny, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The Pretrial conference scheduled for 8/24/20 is CANCELLED. See ORDER for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/18/2020.(TMA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Uptime Systems, LLC. Jointly Signed by Kennard Law, P.C..(Cerny, Steven)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Chief Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Chief Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. (HAZ)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #10 Motion to Remand to State Court, Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Uptime Systems, LLC.(Cerny, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Uptime Systems, LLC.(Cerny, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Steven M. Cerny in SUPPORT OF #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Uptime Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 15)(Cerny, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Uptime Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cerny, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION for Attorney Fees : Date and time to be determined. (Cerny, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court , MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Uptime Systems, LLC. (Cerny, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Uptime Systems, LLC. (Cerny, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Cerny on behalf of Uptime Systems, LLC. (Cerny, Steven)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/17/2020. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alfonso Kennard for Kennard Law, P.C. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/28/2020. (NAH)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alfonso Kennard, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7891987 filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Minenko, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. (Minenko, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Kennard Law, P.C.. (Minenko, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1597 JRT/ECW. (CLK)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-19-2924 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7890968) filed by Kennard Law, P.C.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Placeholder for Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment, #3 Placeholder for Order for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Minenko, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uptime Systems, LLC v. Kennard Law, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Upline Systems, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cerny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uptime Systems, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cerny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennard Law, P.C.
Represented By: Michael J Minenko
Represented By: Alfonso Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?