Schimek v. RGS Financial, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Schimek
Defendant: RGS Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01623
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Mary Schimek. Jointly Signed by RGS Financial, Inc..(Hartz, Bennett)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/19/2020. (HAM)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by RGS Financial, Inc.. (Kreidler, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by RGS Financial, Inc. re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal, (Kreidler, Michael)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1623 ECT/TNL. (CLK)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal filed by RGS Financial, Inc. filed by RGS Financial, Inc.. (Kreidler, Michael)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County - Fourth Judicial District, case number none (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7907470) filed by RGS Financial, Inc. No summons requested. Summons and Complaint attached to main document. (Kreidler, Michael) Modified text on 7/24/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schimek v. RGS Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGS Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Kreidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Schimek
Represented By: Bennett Hartz
Represented By: Andrew C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?