State of Minnesota v. American Petroleum Institute et al
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Defendant: Koch Industries, Inc., Flint HIlls Resources, LP, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton, Exxon Mobil Corporation, American Petroleum Institute and Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend
Case Number: 0:2020cv01636
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 37 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #32 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by State of Minnesota.(Currie, Leigh)
September 10, 2020 Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #32 Motion to Remand to State Court. (Currie, Leigh)
September 10, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support re #32 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Currie, Leigh)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED ORDER re #31 Order on Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 9/10/2020.(HAZ)
August 31, 2020 Filing 33 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton re Rule 12. (Atwal, Gurdip)
August 26, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State of Minnesota. (Currie, Leigh)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/26/2020. (HAZ)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney William Anthony Burck for Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, and for Koch Industries, Inc.; granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen Andrew Swedlow for Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, and for Koch Industries, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/18/2020. (NAH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen A. Swedlow. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7975714 filed by Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, Koch Industries, Inc.. (Davis, Andrew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William A. Burck. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7975657 filed by Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, Koch Industries, Inc.. (Davis, Andrew)
August 12, 2020 Filing 27 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing William A. Burck, Stephen A. Swedlow as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule for Remand Motion filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton. (Atwal, Gurdip) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (lmb).
August 6, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER RESPONSE re #24 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. (Blackwell, Jerry)
August 4, 2020 Filing 24 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits and Set Schedule for Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order)(Surdo, Peter)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew Gerald McBride for American Petroleum Institute. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/3/2020. (NAH)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amanda Hawkins for American Petroleum Institute; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian David Schmalzbach for American Petroleum Institute; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Justin Anderson for Exxon Mobil Corporation and for ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Patrick J Conlon for Exxon Mobil Corporation and for ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Theodore V Wells, Jr for Exxon Mobil Corporation and for ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel J Toal for Exxon Mobil Corporation and for ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/28/2020. (NAH)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Each defendant's answer due by 9/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/28/2020. (JMK)
July 28, 2020 Filing 20 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton.(Atwal, Gurdip)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton. (Atwal, Gurdip)
July 27, 2020 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, Koch Industries, Inc.. (Davis, Andrew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Flint HIlls Resources, LP, Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, Koch Industries, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Consent to Removal by Defendants Koch Industries, Inc., Flint Hills Resources, LP, and Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend, LLC (Davis, Andrew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant American Petroleum Institute. (Boyd, Thomas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Toal. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7915382 filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton. (Atwal, Gurdip)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Theodore Wells. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7915370 filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton. (Atwal, Gurdip)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick Conlon. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7915353 filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton. (Atwal, Gurdip)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin Anderson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7915332 filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton. (Atwal, Gurdip)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian D. Schmalzbach. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7915040 filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Boyd, Thomas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amanda S. Hawkins. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7915021 filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Boyd, Thomas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew G. McBride. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7914882 filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Boyd, Thomas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by American Petroleum Institute re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Consent to Removal by Defendant American Petroleum Institute (Boyd, Thomas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Patrick J. Conlon, Theodore V. Wells, Jr., Daniel J. Toal and Justin Anderson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1636 (JRT/HB). (MMP)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton re #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Atwal, Gurdip)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton. (Atwal, Gurdip)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County, MN, case number 62-cv-20-3837 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7914167) filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton, Exxon Mobil Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Appearance, #3 Exhibit(s) Stip of Parties, #4 Exhibit(s) Order, #5 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit(s) 1, #7 Exhibit(s) 2, #8 Exhibit(s) 3, #9 Exhibit(s) 4, #10 Exhibit(s) 5, #11 Exhibit(s) 6, #12 Exhibit(s) 7, #13 Exhibit(s) 8, #14 Exhibit(s) 9, #15 Exhibit(s) 10, #16 Exhibit(s) 11, #17 Civil Cover Sheet) (Atwal, Gurdip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Minnesota v. American Petroleum Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Andrew M. Luger
Represented By: William Anthony Burck
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Swedlow
Represented By: Peter J Schwingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint HIlls Resources, LP
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Andrew M. Luger
Represented By: William Anthony Burck
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Swedlow
Represented By: Peter J Schwingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporaton
Represented By: Gurdip S Atwal
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Represented By: Daniel J Toal
Represented By: Patrick J Conlon
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Theodore V Wells, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Gurdip S Atwal
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Represented By: Daniel J Toal
Represented By: Patrick J Conlon
Represented By: Justin Anderson
Represented By: Theodore V Wells, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Thomas H Boyd
Represented By: Amanda Hawkins
Represented By: Brian David Schmalzbach
Represented By: Andrew Gerald McBride
Represented By: Eric F Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flint Hills Resources Pine Bend
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Represented By: Andrew M. Luger
Represented By: William Anthony Burck
Represented By: Todd A Noteboom
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Swedlow
Represented By: Peter J Schwingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Peter N Surdo
Represented By: Oliver J Larson
Represented By: Leigh K Currie
Represented By: Elizabeth C Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?