Peterson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Peterson
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01702
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
2 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/9/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 10:45 AM BY Conference Bridge (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/29/2020. (JMK)
September 29, 2020 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 29, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 24, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Todd Peterson . (Chester, Anthony)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER on #21 Stipulation for Further Extension of Time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Answer or Otherwise Plead. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 9/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/8/2020. (JMK)
September 8, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 Stipulation. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Todd Peterson. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/29/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 11:15 AM CDT by Conference Bridge (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
September 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement between Plaintiff and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Todd Peterson (Chester, Anthony)
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. (Bennett, Kevin) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (MKB).
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Eric C. Tostrud recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1702 SRN/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 8/11/2020.(KDS)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Callie Barr for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/11/2020. (NAH)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #12 Stipulation of Extension of time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Answer or Otherwise Plead. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/10/2020. (JMK)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #8 Stipulation of Extension of Time for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/10/2020. (JMK)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Todd Peterson. (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Callie Barr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7955584 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Todd Peterson. (Myers, Gregory)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kevin T Bennett for Trans Union LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/7/2020. (NAH)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin T. Bennett. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7947534 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1702 ECT/HB. (KDS)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Trans Union LLC filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Fisher, Bradley)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sherburne County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7944321) filed by Trans Union LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit(s) D - JPMorgan Consent, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Experian Consent, #6 FILED IN ERROR - REFILED Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service) (Fisher, Bradley) Modified text on 8/5/2020 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Peterson
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael A Stephani
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Callie Barr
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Fisher
Represented By: Amy M Sieben
Represented By: Kevin T Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?