Peterson v. Trans Union LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kami Peterson
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01703
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
September 29, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 9/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/8/2020. (HAM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Kami Peterson. (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. (Bennett, Kevin)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/11/2020.(JRE)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Kami Peterson. (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kevin T Bennett for Trans Union LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/7/2020. (NAH)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin T. Bennett. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7947546 filed by Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Fisher, Bradley)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1703 JRT/TNL. (CLK)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sherburne County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7944466) filed by Trans Union LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit(s) D - JPMorgan Consent, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service) (Fisher, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kami Peterson
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael A Stephani
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Fisher
Represented By: Amy M Sieben
Represented By: Kevin T Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?