J&J Chemical Company, Inc. v. Satellite Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: J&J Chemical Company, Inc.
Defendant: Satellite Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01710
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #14 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Satellite Industries, Inc. answer due 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/10/2020.(JMK)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation. (Merrill, Courtland)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Satellite Industries, Inc.. Jointly Signed by J&J Chemical Company, Inc.. (Merrill, Courtland)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtland C Merrill on behalf of Satellite Industries, Inc.. (Merrill, Courtland)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric V.C. Jansson for J&J Chemical Company, Inc.; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter N Jansson for J&J Chemical Company, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/28/2020. (NAH)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter N. Jansson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7998978 filed by J&J Chemical Company, Inc.. (Bushnell, Sarah)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Molly H. McKinley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7998916 filed by J&J Chemical Company, Inc.. (Bushnell, Sarah) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (NAH).
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric V.C. Jansson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7998863 filed by J&J Chemical Company, Inc.. (Bushnell, Sarah)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Chemical Company, Inc. Satellite Industries, Inc., served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Bushnell, Sarah) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (MMP).
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement - Demand for Jury Trial served on John Babcock, President of Satellite Industries, Inc. on 8/20/2020, filed by J&J Chemical Company, Inc.., SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Chemical Company, Inc.. Satellite Industries, Inc. served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Bushnell, Sarah) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (MMP).
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Peter N. Jansson, Molly H. McKinley, Eric V.C. Jansson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Satellite Industries, Inc. (MKB)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright/Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1710 (JRT/HB). (MKB)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff J&J Chemical Company, Inc.. (Bushnell, Sarah)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement - Demand for Jury Trial against Satellite Industries, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7945918) filed by J&J Chemical Company, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bushnell, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Chemical Company, Inc. v. Satellite Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satellite Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Courtland C Merrill
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Chemical Company, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah E Bushnell
Represented By: Peter N Jansson
Represented By: Eric V.C. Jansson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?