Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina et al v. Rite Aid Corp., et al
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina (f/k/a North Carolina Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Inc.), Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota (f/k/a Noridian Mutual Insurance Company (d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota)), Regence BlueShield of Washington (d/b/a Regence BlueShield), Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc. (d/b/a Horizon NJ Health), Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. (d/b/a Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey), Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, North Carolina Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc. doing business as Horizon NJ Health, Regence BlueShield of Washington doing business as Regence BlueShield, Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. doing business as Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey and Noridian Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Corp. and Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01731
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER on #37 Stipulation to Extend Word Limits and Set Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 10/16/2020. Responses due by 11/6/2020. Replies due by 11/20/2020. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2020 at 9:00 AM by Video Conference before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. See Order for specifics and deadlines. Instructions for joining the hearing will be sent separately to counsel. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/2/2020.(RMM) Modified text on 10/2/2020 (RMM).
October 1, 2020 Filing 38 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #37 Stipulation. (Breyer, K)
October 1, 2020 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Extend Word Limits and Set Briefing Schedule by Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. Jointly Signed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina et al.. (Breyer, K)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael James Ableson for Rite Aid Corp. and for Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/22/2020. (NAH)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #32 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Margot G. Bloom for Rite Aid Corp. and for Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.; granting #33 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Troy S. Brown for Rite Aid Corp. and for Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.; granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David Weese Marston, Jr for Rite Aid Corp. and for Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/21/2020. (NAH)
September 17, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David W. Marston, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8065283 filed by Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Breyer, K)
September 17, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Troy S. Brown. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8065271 filed by Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Breyer, K)
September 17, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margot G. Bloom. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8065263 filed by Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Breyer, K)
September 17, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Ableson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BMNDC-8064892 filed by Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Breyer, K)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #28 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Rite Aid Corp. answer due 10/16/2020; Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. answer due 10/16/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/2/2020.(KAT)
September 1, 2020 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #28 Stipulation,,. (Breyer, K)
September 1, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. Jointly Signed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Asuris Northwest Health, Regence Blue Cross Blue Shield of Utah, Regence Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oregon, Regence Blue Cross Blue Shield of Washington, Regence Blue Cross Blue Shield of Idaho, and Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Breyer, K)
September 1, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R Shedlock on behalf of Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Shedlock, Andrew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by K Jon Breyer on behalf of Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Breyer, K)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jerome P DeSanto for Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., and for Regence BlueShield of Washington; granting #21 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel William Wolff for Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., and for Regence BlueShield of Washington; granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen John McBrady for Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., and for Regence BlueShield of Washington; granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kent Alan Gardiner for Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., and for Regence BlueShield of Washington. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/28/2020. (NAH)
August 26, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jerome P. DeSanto. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8001577 filed by Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Regence BlueShield of Washington. (Crosby, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kent A. Gardiner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8001560 filed by Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Regence BlueShield of Washington. (Crosby, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen J. McBrady. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8001529 filed by Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Regence BlueShield of Washington. (Crosby, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel W. Wolff. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8001448 filed by Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc., Regence BlueShield of Washington. (Crosby, David)
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueShield of Washington, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.. Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Crosby, David)
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc., Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc., Regence BlueShield of Washington, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Asuris Northwest Health, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota, Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon, Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.. Rite Aid Corp. served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Crosby, David)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Nancy E. Brasel recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1731 (ECT/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 8/11/2020.(MMP)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susan Richard Nelson recused. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1731 (NEB/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 8/11/2020.(MMP)
August 10, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Regence BlueShield of Washington. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc.. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc.. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Cambia Health Solutions, Inc.. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Asuris Northwest Health. (Crosby, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kent A. Gardiner, Stephen J. McBrady, Daniel W. Wolff, Jay DeSanto, Zach Ruby as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. (MMP)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1731 (SRN/KMM). (MMP)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Redacted Document for #1 Sealed Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Crosby, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT against Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp, Rite Aid Corp.(filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7952959) filed by All Plaintiffs Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crosby, David) Modified text on 8/10/2020 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina et al v. Rite Aid Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina (f/k/a North Carolina Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Inc.)
Represented By: David R Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Oregon
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regence BlueCross BlueShield of Utah
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regence BlueShield of Idaho, Inc.
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cambia Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asuris Northwest Health
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota (f/k/a Noridian Mutual Insurance Company (d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota))
Represented By: David R Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regence BlueShield of Washington (d/b/a Regence BlueShield)
Represented By: David R Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc. (d/b/a Horizon NJ Health)
Represented By: David R Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. (d/b/a Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey)
Represented By: David R Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of North Dakota
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Carolina Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Inc.
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Healthcare of New Jersey, Inc. doing business as Horizon NJ Health
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regence BlueShield of Washington doing business as Regence BlueShield
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. doing business as Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noridian Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: David R Crosby
Represented By: Kent Alan Gardiner
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jerome P DeSanto
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Daniel William Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Represented By: K Jon Breyer
Represented By: Andrew R Shedlock
Represented By: David Weese Marston, Jr
Represented By: Margot G. Bloom
Represented By: Michael James Ableson
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.
Represented By: K Jon Breyer
Represented By: Andrew R Shedlock
Represented By: David Weese Marston, Jr
Represented By: Margot G. Bloom
Represented By: Michael James Ableson
Represented By: Troy S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?