Warner v. Department of Human Services
Plaintiff: Lisa Warner
Defendant: Department of Human Services
Case Number: 0:2020cv01748
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (JMK)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/10/2020.(JMK)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (Attachment: Bowbeer Practice Pointers) (JMK)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lisa Warner. (JGK) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 8/21/2020. (kt)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Human Services filed by Lisa Warner. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4h Civil Rights - Housing/ADA other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 8/21/2020. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?