Hubbard Media Group, LLC et al v. Instagram, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ReelzChannel, LLC and Hubbard Media Group, LLC
Defendant: Instagram, LLC, Instagram, Inc., Facebook Inc. and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01750
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 39 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #33 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 38 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #33 Motion to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support re #33 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #33 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Date and time to be determined. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 35 Declaration of Kollin Zimmermann in Support of #33 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 34 Declaration of Nicholas Wong in Support of #33 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 31 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #26 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 29 Declaration of Nicholas Wong in Support of #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 28 Declaration of Stephanie Ainza in Support of #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC.(Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Date and time to be determined. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 9, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Zimmermann, Kollin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC.(Larus, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC.(Larus, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of John deGarmo in Support of #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC.(Larus, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Filing 22 Declaration of Stanley Hubbard in Support of #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC.(Larus, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Filing 21 Declaration of Blake Foley in Support of #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A to Foley Dec., #2 Exhibit(s) Ex B to Foley Dec., #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C to Foley Dec., #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D to Foley Dec., #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. E to Foley Dec., #6 Exhibit(s) Ex. F to Foley Dec., #7 Exhibit(s) Ex. G to Foley Dec., #8 Exhibit(s) Ex. H to Foley Dec., #9 Exhibit(s) Ex. I to Foley Dec., #10 Exhibit(s) Ex. J to Foley Dec., #11 Exhibit(s) Ex. K to Foley Dec., #12 Exhibit(s) Ex. L to Foley Dec., #13 Exhibit(s) Ex. M to Foley Dec., #14 Exhibit(s) Ex. N to Foley Dec., #15 Exhibit(s) Ex. O to Foley Dec., #16 Exhibit(s) Ex. P to Foley Dec.)(Larus, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 Declaration of William Manske in Support of #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex A to Manske Dec., #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B to Manske Dec., #3 Exhibit(s) Ex C to Manske Dec., #4 Exhibit(s) Ex D to Manske Dec., #5 Exhibit(s) Ex E to Manske Dec., #6 Exhibit(s) Ex F to Manske Dec., #7 Exhibit(s) Ex G to Manske Dec., #8 Exhibit(s) Ex H to Manske Dec., #9 Exhibit(s) Ex I to Manske Dec., #10 Exhibit(s) Ex. J to Manske Dec., #11 Exhibit(s) Ex. K to Manske Dec., #12 Exhibit(s) Ex. L to Manske Dec., #13 Exhibit(s) Ex. M to Manske Dec., #14 Exhibit(s) Ex. N to Manske Dec., #15 Exhibit(s) Ex. O to Manske Dec., #16 Exhibit(s) Ex. P to Manske Dec., #17 Exhibit(s) Ex. Q to Manske Dec., #18 Exhibit(s) Ex. R to Manske Dec., #19 Exhibit(s) Ex. S to Manske Dec., #20 Exhibit(s) Ex. T to Manske Dec., #21 Exhibit(s) Ex. U to Manske Dec., #22 Exhibit(s) Ex. V to Manske Dec., #23 Exhibit(s) Ex. W to Manske Dec., #24 Exhibit(s) Ex. X to Manske Dec., #25 Exhibit(s) Ex. Y to Manske Dec., #26 Exhibit(s) Ex. Z to Manske Dec., #27 Exhibit(s) Ex. AA to Manske Dec., #28 Exhibit(s) Ex. BB to Manske Dec., #29 Exhibit(s) Ex. CC to Manske Dec., #30 Exhibit(s) Ex. DD to Manske Dec., #31 Exhibit(s) Ex. EE to Manske Dec., #32 Exhibit(s) Ex. FF to Manske Dec., #33 Exhibit(s) Ex. GG to Manske Dec., #34 Exhibit(s) Ex. HH to Manske Dec.)(Larus, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC.(Larus, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Larus, Christopher)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC. (Larus, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kollin J Zimmermann for Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., and for Instagram, LLC; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dennis LeRoy Wilson for Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., and for Instagram, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/27/2020. (NAH)
August 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dennis L. Wilson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8001058 filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Sherman, Eric)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kollin J. Zimmermann. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8001031 filed by Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Sherman, Eric)
August 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R Sherman on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Sherman, Eric)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stanley Panikowski for Hubbard Media Group, LLC and for ReelzChannel, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/25/2020. (NAH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by ReelzChannel, LLC, Hubbard Media Group, LLC. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Instagram, Inc. waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Instagram, LLC waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Manske, William)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ann Katherine Ford for Hubbard Media Group, LLC and for ReelzChannel, LLC; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kerry Anne O'Neill for Hubbard Media Group, LLC and for ReelzChannel, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/21/2020. (NAH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiffs Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC. (Manske, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas Zutic. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7984264 filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC. (Manske, William) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (NAH).
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stanley Panikowski. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7984257 filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC. (Manske, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kerry O'Neill. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7984244 filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC. (Manske, William)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ann Ford. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7984217 filed by Hubbard Media Group, LLC, ReelzChannel, LLC. (Manske, William)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ann K. Ford, Thomas E. Zutic, Stanley J. Panikowski, Kerry O'Neill as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., Instagram, Inc., Instagram, LLC. (MKB)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright/Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1750 (DSD/ECW). (MKB)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7960380) filed by ReelzChannel, LLC, Hubbard Media Group, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Larus, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard Media Group, LLC et al v. Instagram, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, LLC
Represented By: Kollin J Zimmermann
Represented By: Dennis LeRoy Wilson
Represented By: Eric R Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instagram, Inc.
Represented By: Kollin J Zimmermann
Represented By: Dennis LeRoy Wilson
Represented By: Eric R Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Kollin J Zimmermann
Represented By: Dennis LeRoy Wilson
Represented By: Eric R Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ReelzChannel, LLC
Represented By: Christopher K Larus
Represented By: Stanley Panikowski
Represented By: Kerry Anne O'Neill
Represented By: Ann Katherine Ford
Represented By: William E. Manske
Represented By: George Benson Ashenmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubbard Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Christopher K Larus
Represented By: Stanley Panikowski
Represented By: Kerry Anne O'Neill
Represented By: Ann Katherine Ford
Represented By: William E. Manske
Represented By: George Benson Ashenmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?