Widner vs. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff: Travis Widner
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. doing business as Chase Bank
Case Number: 0:2020cv01752
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12188
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(CLK)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/28/2020.(HAZ)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Travis Widner. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. JPMorgan Chase & Co. response due 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/17/2020.(TMA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Palamountain, Kathryn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by JPMorgan Chase & Co.. Jointly Signed by Travis Widner. (Palamountain, Kathryn)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathryn Christine Palamountain for JPMorgan Chase & Co. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/13/2020. (NAH)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathryn Palamountain. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7965175 filed by JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.. (Berg, Marc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1752 JRT/ECW. (KDS) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (KDS).
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathryn Palamountain. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7962228 filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a Chase Bank. (Berg, Marc) Modified text on 8/13/2020 (NAH).
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a Chase Bank. (Berg, Marc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a Chase Bank, Travis Widner filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a Chase Bank. (Berg, Marc)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT from Second Judicial District - Ramsey County, case number 62-CV-20-4327 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7961541) filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co. d/b/a Chase Bank. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C to Notice of Removal) (Berg, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Widner vs. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Widner
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. doing business as Chase Bank
Represented By: Marc M Berg
Represented By: Kathryn Christine Palamountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?