Boyd v. Saul
Plaintiff: Keisha A Boyd and Keisha A. Boyd
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv01794
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Keisha A. Boyd. Andrew Saul served on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2020 (MMG).
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda H Green on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Green, Linda)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (MKB)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/19/2020. (JMK)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (KNK) (KNK).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-1794 (HB). (KNK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Keisha A Boyd. (Krause, Thomas)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul filed by Keisha A Boyd. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Krause, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha A Boyd
Represented By: Thomas A Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha A. Boyd
Represented By: Thomas A Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Linda H Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?