Ludwig v. Don Hummer Trucking Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Ludwig
Defendant: Joseph William Welch and Don Hummer Trucking Corporation
Case Number: 0:2020cv01810
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Don Hummer Trucking Corporation, Joseph William Welch. Jointly Signed by Daniel Ludwig.(Burke, Michael)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Burke on behalf of Don Hummer Trucking Corporation, Joseph William Welch. (Burke, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 10/27/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/27/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/22/2200. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1810 (ECT/DTS). (MKB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Don Hummer Trucking Corporation, Joseph William Welch. (Wood, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Don Hummer Trucking Corporation, Joseph William Welch. (Wood, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7983647) filed by Joseph William Welch, Don Hummer Trucking Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) Other State Court Documents, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ludwig v. Don Hummer Trucking Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ludwig
Represented By: Richard J Schroeder
Represented By: Peter J Kestner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph William Welch
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Michael T. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Hummer Trucking Corporation
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Michael T. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?