National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al v. Agility Fuel Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Constance Insurance Company in its own right and as Insurer of Swagelok Company and San Diego Valve & Fitting Co. Inc; d/b/a San Diego Fluid System Technologies and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA in its own right and as Insurer of Swagelok Company and San Diego Valve & Fitting Co. Inc; d/b/a San Diego Fluid System Technologies
Defendant: Agility Fuel Solutions LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01819
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Agility Fuel Solutions LLC. Jointly Signed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and Constance Insurance Company.(Sitek, Steven)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER on #17 Stipulation to Release Settlement Agreements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/2/2020.(EB)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER on #21 Stipulation for Protective Order & PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/2/2020.(EB)
September 29, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Rubinstein, Jonathan)
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Jointly signed by both parties. (Rubinstein, Jonathan) Modified text on 10/1/2020 (kt).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference in this case will be held by telephone. A call-in number will be provided by the Court. The parties are not required to conduct any applicable meet and confers in person. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/22/2020. (HAM)
September 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John N Bisanz, Jr on behalf of Constance Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Bisanz, John)
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Sitek, Steven)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION TO RELEASE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS by Agility Fuel Solutions LLC. Jointly Signed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA and Constance Insurance Company. (Sitek, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Agility Fuel Solutions LLC. (Sitek, Steven)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Ceee O. Boomsma on behalf of Agility Fuel Solutions LLC. (Boomsma, Leah)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Agility Fuel Solutions LLC. (Sitek, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan Rubinstein for Constance Insurance Company and for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joel S Rosen for Constance Insurance Company and for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/25/2020. (NAH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Olsen, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiff Constance Insurance Company. (Olsen, David)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Constance Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA re #1 Complaint, (Olsen, David)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joel S. Rosen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7991774 filed by Constance Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Olsen, David)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jon D. Rubinstein. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7991618 filed by Constance Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Olsen, David)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M Sitek on behalf of Agility Fuel Solutions LLC. (Sitek, Steven)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Joel S Rosen, Jon D. Rubinstein as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Agility Fuel Solutions LLC. (MMG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1819. (MMG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Agility Fuel Solutions LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7987319) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Constance Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olsen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA et al v. Agility Fuel Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agility Fuel Solutions LLC
Represented By: Leah Ceee O. Boomsma
Represented By: Steven M Sitek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Insurance Company in its own right and as Insurer of Swagelok Company and San Diego Valve & Fitting Co. Inc; d/b/a San Diego Fluid System Technologies
Represented By: David Bradley Olsen
Represented By: Jonathan Rubinstein
Represented By: Joel S Rosen
Represented By: John N Bisanz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA in its own right and as Insurer of Swagelok Company and San Diego Valve & Fitting Co. Inc; d/b/a San Diego Fluid System Technologies
Represented By: David Bradley Olsen
Represented By: Jonathan Rubinstein
Represented By: Joel S Rosen
Represented By: John N Bisanz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?