Bruntjen Esq. v. Van Exel et al
Plaintiff: Justin Andrew Bruntjen Esq.
Defendant: Ward Allen White, IV, Keith Anthony Cutler, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP, Kennedy Lowell Barnes, James W. Tippin & Associates and Raffles Van Exel
Case Number: 0:2020cv01832
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the deadline for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Rule 12 Motions is extended to October 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/13/2020. (GRR)
October 11, 2020 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulation to Extend Plaintiff's Response to Motion #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,. (Hutton, Lee)
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6), #20 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #23 Declaration in Support, #22 Declaration in Support, #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #25 Meet and Confer Statement, #24 Declaration in Support, #26 Proposed Order to Judge, #18 Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion, filed by Justin Andrew Bruntjen Esq.. (Hutton, Lee)
October 7, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Kennedy Lowell Barnes, Ward Allen White, IV, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP.(Kuipers, Laura)
October 7, 2020 Filing 25 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Kennedy Lowell Barnes, Ward Allen White, IV, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP.(Kuipers, Laura)
October 7, 2020 Filing 24 Declaration of Kennedy Lowell Barnes in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Kennedy Lowell Barnes, Ward Allen White, IV, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP.(Kuipers, Laura)
October 7, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of Kevin B. Wiggins in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Kennedy Lowell Barnes, Ward Allen White, IV, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP.(Kuipers, Laura)
October 7, 2020 Filing 22 Declaration of Ward Allen White IV in Support of #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Kennedy Lowell Barnes, Ward Allen White, IV, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP.(Kuipers, Laura)
October 7, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Kennedy Lowell Barnes, Ward Allen White, IV, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kuipers, Laura)
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Kuipers, Laura)
October 7, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Kennedy Lowell Barnes, Ward Allen White, IV, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP. (Kuipers, Laura)
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Cutler's and Tippin's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), or, Alternatively, Rule 12(b)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Proczko, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #15 Stipulation to Extend WWB Defendants' Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Kennedy Lowell Barnes answer due 10/8/2020; Ward Allen White, IV answer due 10/8/2020; White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP answer due 10/8/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/23/2020.(KAT)
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Kuipers, Laura)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend WWB Defendants' Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Kennedy Lowell Barnes, Ward Allen White, IV, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP. Jointly Signed by Justin A. Bruntjen. (Kuipers, Laura)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Cutler's and Tippin's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), or, Alternatively, Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Keith Anthony Cutler, James W. Tippin & Associates.(Proczko, Christopher) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (CLK).
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General, filed by Keith Anthony Cutler, James W. Tippin & Associates.(Proczko, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 EXHIBIT 1 re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Keith Anthony Cutler, James W. Tippin & Associates.(Proczko, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Cutler's and Tippin's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), or, Alternatively, Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Keith Anthony Cutler, James W. Tippin & Associates. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Proczko, Christopher) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (CLK).
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Cutler's and Tippin's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), or, Alternatively, Rule 12(b)(6) : Date and time to be determined. (Proczko, Christopher) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (CLK).
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Cutler's and Tippin's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), or, Alternatively, Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Keith Anthony Cutler, James W. Tippin & Associates. (Proczko, Christopher) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (CLK).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Keith A. Cutler for Keith Anthony Cutler and for James W. Tippin & Associates. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/21/2020. (NAH)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith A. Cutler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8065974 filed by Keith Anthony Cutler, James W. Tippin & Associates. (Proczko, Christopher)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Proczko on behalf of Keith Anthony Cutler, James W. Tippin & Associates. (Proczko, Christopher)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin M Wolpert on behalf of Keith Anthony Cutler, James W. Tippin & Associates. (Wolpert, Robin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kennedy Lowell Barnes, Keith Anthony Cutler, James W. Tippin & Associates, Raffles Van Exel, Ward Allen White, IV, White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP. (KDS)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1832 MJD/KMM. (KDS)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A Hutton, III on behalf of Justin Andrew Bruntjen. (Hutton, Lee)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7994734) filed by Justin Andrew Bruntjen. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hutton, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruntjen Esq. v. Van Exel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ward Allen White, IV
Represented By: M Gregory Simpson
Represented By: Laura E. Kuipers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Anthony Cutler
Represented By: Keith A. Cutler
Represented By: Christopher Proczko
Represented By: Robin M Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White, Wiggins & Barnes, LLP
Represented By: M Gregory Simpson
Represented By: Laura E. Kuipers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Lowell Barnes
Represented By: M Gregory Simpson
Represented By: Laura E. Kuipers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Tippin & Associates
Represented By: Keith A. Cutler
Represented By: Christopher Proczko
Represented By: Robin M Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raffles Van Exel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Andrew Bruntjen Esq.
Represented By: Lee A Hutton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?