Great Gulf Corporation v. Graham et al
Plaintiff: Great Gulf Corporation
Defendant: Randolph M. Pentel, William Talford Graham and R. P. Air, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01835
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/22/2020.(CLG)
October 22, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE: Remote Public Access to Motion Hearing on 12/11/2020 at 8:30 AM. To obtain the dial-in instructions, email Caryn Glover at Schiltz_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov. (CLG)
October 22, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Great Gulf Corporation re #26 Meet and Confer Statement, #27 Proposed Order to Judge, #22 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested, #23 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #24 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #25 Affidavit in Support of Motion, (Hansen, Erik)
October 20, 2020 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Great Gulf Corporation.(Hansen, Erik)
October 20, 2020 Filing 26 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Great Gulf Corporation.(Hansen, Erik)
October 20, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Troy Wilson in SUPPORT OF #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Great Gulf Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EXHIBITS 1-6 OF TROY WILSON AFF)(Hansen, Erik)
October 20, 2020 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Erik F Hansen in SUPPORT OF #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Great Gulf Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) exhibits a-d)(Hansen, Erik)
October 20, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Great Gulf Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hansen, Erik)
October 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Hansen, Erik)
October 20, 2020 Filing 21 WITHDRAWN per Notice #28 . MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Great Gulf Corporation. (Hansen, Erik) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (KDS).
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Great Gulf Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tisher, Kirk)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/23/2020. (HAM)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by William Talford Graham, Randolph M. Pentel, R. P. Air, Inc..(Sellers, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by William Talford Graham, Randolph M. Pentel, R. P. Air, Inc..(Sellers, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Jacob B. Sellers in SUPPORT OF #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by William Talford Graham, Randolph M. Pentel, R. P. Air, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L)(Sellers, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by William Talford Graham, Randolph M. Pentel, R. P. Air, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sellers, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Sellers, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by William Talford Graham, Randolph M. Pentel, R. P. Air, Inc.. (Sellers, Jacob)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justice Ericson Lindell on behalf of William Talford Graham. (Lindell, Justice)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob B Sellers on behalf of William Talford Graham. (Sellers, Jacob)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant William Talford Graham on August 27, 2020, filed by Great Gulf Corporation. (Tisher, Kirk) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (KDS).
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justice Ericson Lindell on behalf of Randolph M. Pentel, R. P. Air, Inc.. (Lindell, Justice)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob B Sellers on behalf of Randolph M. Pentel, R. P. Air, Inc.. (Sellers, Jacob)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on Randolph Pentel on 8/30/20, filed by Great Gulf Corporation. (Tisher, Kirk)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on R.P Air Inc. on 8/30/20, filed by Great Gulf Corporation. (Tisher, Kirk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk Tisher on behalf of Great Gulf Corporation. (Tisher, Kirk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Great Gulf Corporation. (Tisher, Kirk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William Talford Graham, Randolph M. Pentel, R. P. Air, Inc.. (kt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1835 PJS/TNL. (kt)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Talford Graham, Randolph M Pentel, R. P. Air, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7995554) filed by Great Gulf Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EX A, C, E, F G H, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex B - redacted, #3 Exhibit(s) EX D - REDACTED, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tisher, Kirk) Modified text on 8/24/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Gulf Corporation v. Graham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph M. Pentel
Represented By: Justice Ericson Lindell
Represented By: Jacob B Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Talford Graham
Represented By: Justice Ericson Lindell
Represented By: Jacob B Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. P. Air, Inc.
Represented By: Justice Ericson Lindell
Represented By: Jacob B Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Gulf Corporation
Represented By: Kirk Tisher
Represented By: Erik F Hansen
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Cadem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?