Bujak v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Bujak
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01838
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 11/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/19/2020. (HAM)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Hoglund, Lauren)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #12 Stipulation. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/22/2020. (HAM)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE DEFEND by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Alexander Bujak. (Kaluza, Kristina)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 9/21/2020. (HAM)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Hoglund, Lauren)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Bujak. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Dunn, Christopher)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Bujak. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Dunn, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (MMP)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1838 (JRT/TNL). (MMP)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Dakroub on behalf of Alexander Bujak. (Dakroub, Jenna)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Dunn on behalf of Alexander Bujak. (Dunn, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7997930) filed by Alexander Bujak. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dunn, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bujak v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Hoglund
Represented By: Terrance J Wagener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael A Stephani
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Bujak
Represented By: Jenna Dakroub
Represented By: Christopher Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?