Huang v. Knowledge Computers Inc.
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Knowledge Computers Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01873
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion to Seal the Complaint (ECF No. 7). The Complaint (ECF No. 1) was filed publicly on 8/31/2020 and has been accessible to the public since that time. Moreover, there is a presumption of public access to judicial records that can be overcome only by a showing of a compelling reason why that right of access is outweighed by the party's interest in maintaining the confidentiality of the information sought to be sealed. Plaintiff's motion offers no explanation whatsoever, let alone a compelling reason, for the request to seal the Complaint. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Seal is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/22/2020. (JMK)
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to SEAL #1 Complaint, filed by Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(CLK)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xiaohua Huang. Knowledge Computers Inc. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 10/9/2020 (MMG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing) filed by Xiaohua Huang. (MMG) Document QC'd on 9/25/2020 (MMG).
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Knowledge Computers Inc.. CC: Xiaohua Huang w/ Information Sheet. (JGK)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Huang enclosing AO 120 form. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 Form)(kt)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Knowledge Computers Inc. (filing fee $400, receipt number 4-108509) filed by Xiaohua Huang. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C, #2 Exhibit(s) E, #3 Exhibit(s) T, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Envelope) (JGK) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 9/1/2020. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Knowledge Computers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knowledge Computers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?