Wright v. Greiner
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright doing business as JQ Licensing, LLC
Defendant: Molly Greiner doing business as Lake Winnie's Gosh Dam Place
Case Number: 0:2020cv01878
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Molly Greiner. (Warner, Stephen)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Molly Greiner. (Warner, Stephen)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. Molly Greiner answer due 10/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 10/15/2020. (JLB)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Non-Compliance with #Local Rule 7.1 Civil Motion Practice for #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by attorney Eric Menhart. Proposed Order not emailed to the Judge in word processing format. Please file according to the rule and contact the appropriate chambers if further direction is needed. (JLB)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Molly Greiner. (Menhart, Eric)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric Menhart for Molly Greiner. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/25/2020. (NAH)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Menhart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8085964 filed by Molly Greiner. (Essien, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jon Q. Wright. Molly Greiner served on 9/18/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Hansen, Nathan)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dmitry Lapin for Jon Q. Wright. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/3/2020. (NAH)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dmitry Lapin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8018580 filed by Jon Q. Wright. (Hansen, Nathan)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Hansen, Nathan) cc: U.S. Copyright Office. (kt)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Dmitry Lapin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (lmb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Molly Greiner. (lmb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (5th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (lmb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Molly Greiner (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8015134) filed by Jon Q. Wright. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Hansen, Nathan) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Greiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Q. Wright doing business as JQ Licensing, LLC
Represented By: Nathan M Hansen
Represented By: Dmitry Lapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Greiner doing business as Lake Winnie's Gosh Dam Place
Represented By: Michael A Essien
Represented By: Stephen M Warner
Represented By: Eric Menhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?