Cumulus Investors, LLC v. Hiscox, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cumulus Investors, LLC
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc. and Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv01919
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marci Goldstein Kokalas for Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. and for Hiscox, Inc.; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph A. Oliva for Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. and for Hiscox, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/29/2020. (NAH)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Carrie Marie Raver for Cumulus Investors, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/28/2020. (NAH)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph A. Oliva. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8176718 filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc.. (Goodman, Christopher)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marci Goldstein Kokalas. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8176696 filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc.. (Goodman, Christopher)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Carrie M. Raver. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8151679 filed by Cumulus Investors, LLC. (Lynch, Christopher)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #11 Stipulation Extending Defendants Hiscox, Inc. and Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc's Time to Respond to the Complaint and Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Dispositive Motion. Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. answer due 11/9/2020; Hiscox, Inc. answer due 11/9/2020. In the event Defendants file a dispositive motion in lieu of filing an Answer to the Complaint, the time for Plaintiff response due by12/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/19/2020.(JMK)
October 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Goodman on behalf of Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc.. (Goodman, Christopher)
October 16, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Goodman, Christopher)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Cumulus Investors, LLC. (Goodman, Christopher)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott Godes for Cumulus Investors, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/1/2020. (NAH)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cumulus Investors, LLC. Hiscox, Inc. served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Lynch, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cumulus Investors, LLC. Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Lynch, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott N. Godes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8096782 filed by Cumulus Investors, LLC. (Lynch, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Scott N. Godes, Carrie Marie Raver as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox, Inc. (MKB)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1919 (ECT/HB). (MKB)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Cumulus Investors, LLC. (Lynch, Christopher)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cumulus Investors, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8037285) filed by Cumulus Investors, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1) (Lynch, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cumulus Investors, LLC v. Hiscox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox, Inc.
Represented By: Marci Goldstein Kokalas
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Represented By: Joseph A. Oliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.
Represented By: Marci Goldstein Kokalas
Represented By: Christopher L. Goodman
Represented By: Joseph A. Oliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cumulus Investors, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L Lynch
Represented By: Carrie Marie Raver
Represented By: Scott Godes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?