Fredin v. Kreil
Plaintiff: Brock Fredin
Defendant: Jamie Kreil
Case Number: 0:2020cv01929
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
2 Judge: David T Schultz
3 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Designate Brock Fredin a Vexatious Litigant filed by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fredin, Brock)
November 5, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Brock Fredin re #28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, #27 MOTION for Sanctions Requesting Rule 11 Sua Sponte Cross Sanctions Under the Court's Inherent Authority Imposed on Defendant Kreil and Robins Kaplan Attorneys Anne M. Lockner, Haynes Hansen, and Ena Kovacevic by Brock Fredin . (Fredin, Brock)
November 5, 2020 Filing 29 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #27 Motion for Sanctions, filed by Brock Fredin.(Fredin, Brock)
November 5, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Attorney Fees , #27 MOTION for Sanctions Requesting Rule 11 Sua Sponte Cross Sanctions Under the Court's Inherent Authority Imposed on Defendant Kreil and Robins Kaplan Attorneys Anne M. Lockner, Haynes Hansen, and Ena Kovacevic filed by Brock Fredin. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fredin, Brock)
November 5, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION for Sanctions Requesting Rule 11 Sua Sponte Cross Sanctions Under the Court's Inherent Authority Imposed on Defendant Kreil and Robins Kaplan Attorneys Anne M. Lockner, Haynes Hansen, and Ena Kovacevic filed by Brock Fredin. (Fredin, Brock) Modified text on 11/6/2020 (MMP).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING Extension Requested in Letter to District Judge ( 231 in 0:17-cv-03058-SRN-HB; 200 in 0:18-cv-00466-SRN-HB; #25 in 0:20-cv-01929-SRN-HB) re: deadlines in response to pending Motions for TRO in these cases. Response(s) now due by 11/5/2020. Replies due by 11/19/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/3/2020. Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-03058-SRN-HB, 0:18-cv-00466-SRN-HB, 0:20-cv-01929-SRN-HB (SMD)
November 2, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Brock Fredin Requesting Three Day Extension to File Response Brief to Defendants Temporary Restraining Order Request. (Fredin, Brock)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jamie Kreil re #23 Declaration in Support, and Exhibit G (Lockner, Anne)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 Second Declaration of Anne M. Lockner in Support of #15 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jamie Kreil. (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for Exhibit G (Sealed Flash Drive))(Lockner, Anne) Document received in Clerk's Office on 10/23/2020 (JGK).
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 BRIEFING ORDER re: #15 Motion for Sanctions, Motion for TRO, Motion for Attorney Fees. Response due by 11/2/2020. Reply due by 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/22/2020. (SMD)
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jamie Kreil.(Lockner, Anne)
October 21, 2020 Filing 20 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #19 Sealed Document(s) - #19 Sealed Exhibit A, [19-1] Sealed Exhibit B, [19-2] Sealed Exhibit C, [19-3] Sealed Exhibit D, [19-4] Sealed Exhibit E, [19-5] Sealed Exhibit F filed by Jamie Kreil.(Lockner, Anne)
October 21, 2020 Filing 19 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit A re #18 Declaration in Support filed by Jamie Kreil. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit B, #2 Sealed Exhibit C, #3 Sealed Exhibit D, #4 Sealed Exhibit E, #5 Sealed Exhibit F)(Lockner, Anne)
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Anne M. Lockner in Support of #15 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jamie Kreil.(Lockner, Anne)
October 21, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jamie Kreil. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lockner, Anne)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Attorney Fees : Date and time to be determined. (Lockner, Anne)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jamie Kreil. (Lockner, Anne)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Designate Brock Fredin a Vexatious Litigant filed by Jamie Kreil.(Lockner, Anne)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #10 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Jamie Kreil.(Lockner, Anne)
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Designate Brock Fredin a Vexatious Litigant filed by Jamie Kreil. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lockner, Anne)
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Designate Brock Fredin a Vexatious Litigant : Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2021 at 09:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Lockner, Anne)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss/General Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), MOTION to Designate Brock Fredin a Vexatious Litigant filed by Jamie Kreil. (Lockner, Anne)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-01929 SRN/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 10/7/2020 and Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 10/8/2020.(MTP)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brock Fredin re #6 Amended Complaint (Fredin, Brock)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Brock Fredin. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) (Fredin, Brock) Modified text on 10/2/2020 (MMP).
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jamie Kreil Notice of Related Cases (Lockner, Anne)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jamie Kreil. cc: Brock Fredin w/ Information Sheet. (JGK)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Brock Fredin is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Brock Fredin has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jamie Kreil (filing fee $400, receipt number 3-1016044) filed by Brock Fredin. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 9/30/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fredin v. Kreil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Fredin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Kreil
Represented By: Anne M Lockner
Represented By: Ena Kovacevic
Represented By: Haynes Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?