Parker v. Saul
Plaintiff: Phillip Parker
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv01983
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Saul re #7 Notice of Appearance (Carillo, Chris)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Carillo on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Carillo, Chris)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO PARTIES: The clerk's office has prepared and sent the service packets to the U.S. Marshal Service for service of process per Order #4 . Plaintiff does not need to file a Summons Returned Executed. (lmb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (lmb)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/24/2020. (TJB)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (JGK)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Phillip Parker. (NAH)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Phillip Parker. Case assigned to Judge David T. Schultz per Social Security list. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Chris Carillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?