Huang v. Computer Connection Corporation
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Computer Connection Corporation
Case Number: 0:2020cv01988
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT ON DETERMINATION OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing.) filed by Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (MMP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2020 (MMG).
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xiaohua Huang. Computer Connection Corporation served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (MMP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2020 (MMG).
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Huang enclosing AO 120 form. (Attachments: #1 AO 120 Form)(NAH) cc: Huang. Modified text on 9/18/2020 (NAH).
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Computer Connection Corporation. (NAH) cc: Huang w/ Service Info Sheet. Modified text on 9/17/2020 (NAH).
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Computer Connection Corporation (filing fee $400, receipt number 44641108671) filed by Xiaohua Huang. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) T, #5 Cover Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Envelope) (NAH). Document QC'd on 9/29/2020 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Computer Connection Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Connection Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?