Miner v. Saul
Plaintiff: Kelly Miner
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv02034
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Carillo on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Carillo, Chris)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Andrew Saul. Andrew Saul served on 10/5/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (KNK)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (MKB)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/25/2020. (TMA)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Clifford Michael Farrell for Kelly Miner. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/25/2020. (NAH)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-2034 (ECW). (KNK)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Clifford M. Farrell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8081387 filed by Kelly Miner. (Olson, Edward)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Kelly Miner. (Olson, Edward)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Kelly Miner. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miner v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Chris Carillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Miner
Represented By: Edward C. Olson
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?