White v. Saul
Plaintiff: Zenobia White
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv02036
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Silverman on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Silverman, Marisa)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (CLK)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/30/2020. (JMK)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Zenobia White. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/25/2020. (NAH)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (MTP)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-02036 HB. (MTP)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8081683 filed by Zenobia White. (Olson, Edward)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Zenobia White. (Olson, Edward)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Zenobia White. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Marisa Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zenobia White
Represented By: Edward C. Olson
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?