BCBSM, Inc. et al v. Celgene Corporation et al
Plaintiff: BCBSM, Inc., Molina Healthcare, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation and Celgene Corporation
Case Number: 0:2020cv02071
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #35 Letter to District Judge. The parties' joint request to exceed the word-count limit for briefs regarding Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Each side may use up to 16,000 words for their briefs on Defendants' motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/9/2020. (SMD)
November 9, 2020 Filing 35 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits for briefs addressing Defendants' motion to dismiss. (Luger, Andrew)
November 9, 2020 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT of Informal Dispute Resolution Hearing (audio digital recording) held on 10/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (18 pages). Transcriber: Renee Rogge. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Transcript temporarily sealed to determine if redactions are required. Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction or Notice that No Redaction is Required. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 11/16/2020. Redaction Request due 11/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2021. (RAR)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #30 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles Z Kopel for BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, and for Molina Healthcare, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 11/5/2020. (NAH)
November 2, 2020 Filing 32 REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of a Digital Audio Recording. (Beane, Lisa)
October 30, 2020 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Moccio, Vincent)
October 30, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles Kopel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8185590 filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Moccio, Vincent)
October 29, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Moccio, Vincent)
October 29, 2020 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc..(Moccio, Vincent)
October 29, 2020 Filing 27 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #24 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc..(Moccio, Vincent)
October 29, 2020 Filing 26 Declaration of Jason H. Kim in Support of #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit No. 1)(Moccio, Vincent)
October 29, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc..(Moccio, Vincent)
October 29, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Moccio, Vincent)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER on #21 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/20/2020.(TMA)
October 20, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 Stipulation,. (Luger, Andrew)
October 20, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Scheduling of Adjacent Briefing by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. Jointly Signed by BCBSM, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc., and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Luger, Andrew)
October 16, 2020 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: IDR Telephone Conference held on 10/15/2020. See Minute Entry for further instructions. (SGK)
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Counsel were provided conference bridge instructions via email.(EMCS)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc. Opposing deadline extension through IDR process. (St Phillip, Peter)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation seeking deadline extension through IDR process. (Luger, Andrew)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Toni Citera for Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation and for Celgene Corporation; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian David Hershman for Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation and for Celgene Corporation; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Rajeev Muttreja for Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation and for Celgene Corporation; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin M Greenblum for Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation and for Celgene Corporation; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Colette Connor for Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation and for Celgene Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/14/2020. (NAH)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colette T. Connor. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8127115 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. (Luger, Andrew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin M. Greenblum. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8127080 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. (Luger, Andrew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rajeev Muttreja. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8127023 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. (Luger, Andrew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian D. Hershman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8126995 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. (Luger, Andrew)
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Toni-Ann Citera. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8126965 filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. (Luger, Andrew)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter D. St Phillip, Jr for BCBSM, Inc.; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Uriel Rabinovitz for BCBSM, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/8/2020. (NAH)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #5 Stipulation,. Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation response due 10/21/2020; Celgene Corporation response due 10/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/6/2020.(TMA)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Uriel Rabinovitz,. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8117182 filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Moccio, Vincent)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8117161 filed by BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc.. (Moccio, Vincent)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation,. (Luger, Andrew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. Jointly Signed by BCBSM, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, Molina Healthcare, Inc., and Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Luger, Andrew)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Peter D. St. Phillip, Noelle Ruggiero, Uriel Rabinowitz, Thomas Griffith, Todd M. Schneider, Jason Kim, Matthew S. Weiler, Brian D. Hershman, Toni-Ann Citera, Rajeev Muttreja, Benjamin M. Greenblum, Colette T. Connor as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd,4th Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-2071 (SRN/ECW). (MMP)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendants Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. (Luger, Andrew)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County, case number 19HA-cv-20-2915 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8097611) filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation, Celgene Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luger, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BCBSM, Inc. et al v. Celgene Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Corporation
Represented By: Andrew M. Luger
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Represented By: Colette Connor
Represented By: Benjamin M Greenblum
Represented By: Toni Citera
Represented By: Rajeev Muttreja
Represented By: Brian David Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celgene Corporation
Represented By: Andrew M. Luger
Represented By: Lisa L Beane
Represented By: Colette Connor
Represented By: Benjamin M Greenblum
Represented By: Toni Citera
Represented By: Rajeev Muttreja
Represented By: Brian David Hershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCBSM, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R Bennerotte
Represented By: Vincent J Moccio
Represented By: Uriel Rabinovitz
Represented By: Charles Z Kopel
Represented By: Peter D. St Phillip, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molina Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R Bennerotte
Represented By: Vincent J Moccio
Represented By: Charles Z Kopel
Represented By: Peter D. St Phillip, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Thomas R Bennerotte
Represented By: Vincent J Moccio
Represented By: Charles Z Kopel
Represented By: Peter D. St Phillip, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R Bennerotte
Represented By: Vincent J Moccio
Represented By: Charles Z Kopel
Represented By: Peter D. St Phillip, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?