King v. Bey et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Marlon King
Defendant: Timothy James Walz, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Andrew Marshall Saul, R. Frank Weidner, Donald James Trump and Michael Richard Pompeo
In Re: Naa'El Saddiq Malik Bey
Case Number: 0:2020cv02100
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; adopting Report and Recommendations re #3 Report and Recommendation. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 11/12/2020. (DLO)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER TO CHIEF JUDGE JOHN R. TUNHEIM by Reginald Marlon King. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Reginald Marlon King and #1 Complaint filed by Reginald Marlon King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/22/2020. (KAT)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Reginald Marlon King. (JGK)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Terner Mnuchin, Michael Richard Pompeo, Andrew Marshall Saul, Donald James Trump, Timothy James Walz, R. Frank Weidner filed by Reginald Marlon King. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Bey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy James Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Terner Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Frank Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald James Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Richard Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Naa'El Saddiq Malik Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Marlon King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?