Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota et al v. Atlas Aegis LLC et al
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Minnesota and Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota
Defendant: Anthony Caudle, Atlas Aegis LLC and John Does #1-10
Amicus Curiae: City of Saint Paul
Case Number: 0:2020cv02195
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER on #42 Stipulation. Atlas Aegis LLC answer due 12/15/2020; Anthony Caudle answer due 12/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 12/1/2020.(MSK)
December 1, 2020 Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #42 Stipulation. (Moore, Terrance)
December 1, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATION to extend time to respond to complaint by Atlas Aegis LLC, Anthony Caudle. Jointly Signed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota and League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Moore, Terrance)
November 17, 2020 Filing 41 BOND posted by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (kt) Processed on 12/16/2020 (NAH).
October 30, 2020 Filing 40 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Copy of Bond for Preliminary Injunction)(Erickson, Amy)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The Voter Organizations' motion for a preliminary injunction #4 is GRANTED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/29/2020. (KMW)
October 26, 2020 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2020 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by League of Women Voters of Minnesota, Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota. The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order was moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (KMW)
October 26, 2020 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Terrance W. Moore in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Atlas Aegis LLC, Anthony Caudle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C)(Moore, Terrance)
October 26, 2020 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Anthony Caudle in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Atlas Aegis LLC, Anthony Caudle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Moore, Terrance)
October 26, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Atlas Aegis LLC, Anthony Caudle. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Moore, Terrance)
October 26, 2020 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Status Conference held on 10/26/2020. (KMW)
October 26, 2020 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota.(Klein, Julia)
October 24, 2020 Filing 32 Declaration of Casey Joe Carl in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Klein, Julia)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #30 Letter to District Judge. The Defendant's response to the Motion for TRO is extended to 10/26/20 at noon. No reply brief is required. The hearing on the Motion for TRO will not be rescheduled. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/23/2020.(KMW)
October 23, 2020 Filing 30 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Atlas Aegis LLC, Anthony Caudle . (Moore, Terrance)
October 23, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance W Moore and Carol R. M. Moss on behalf of Atlas Aegis LLC, Anthony Caudle. (Moore, Terrance) Modified text on 10/26/2020 (KDS).
October 23, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. Atlas Aegis LLC served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020; Anthony Caudle served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020; John Does #1-10 served on 10/22/2020, answer due 11/12/2020. (Klein, Julia)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear as Amicus Curiae. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/22/2020. (KMW)
October 22, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 MOTION to Appear as Amicus Curiae filed by City of Saint Paul.(Edwards, Anthony)
October 22, 2020 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Anthony G. Edwards in SUPPORT OF #23 MOTION to Appear as Amicus Curiae filed by City of Saint Paul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-G)(Edwards, Anthony)
October 22, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to Appear as Amicus Curiae PROPOSED MEMORANDUM filed by City of Saint Paul. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Edwards, Anthony)
October 22, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear as Amicus Curiae filed by City of Saint Paul. (Edwards, Anthony)
October 21, 2020 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE: Remote Public Access to #18 Motion Hearing on 10/26/2020 at 3:00 PM.To join the telephonic hearing, dial 669-254-5252. Use access code 160 373 4898 and security code 428241015. Please note this hearing is being held by video/phone conference and not inside Courtroom 3A. The parties on the case shall receive a link to the video conference. (KMW)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew Brinckerhoff for Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota and for League of Women Voters of Minnesota; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney O. Andrew F. Wilson for Council on American - Islamic Relations Minnesota and for League of Women Voters of Minnesota; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan S Abady for Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota and for League of Women Voters of Minnesota; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Vivake Prasad for Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota and for League of Women Voters of Minnesota; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Debra L Greenberger for Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota and for League of Women Voters of Minnesota; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ronald Fein for Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota and for League of Women Voters of Minnesota; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ben Clements for Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota and for League of Women Voters of Minnesota; granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John C. Bonifaz for Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota and for League of Women Voters of Minnesota. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/20/2020. (NAH)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Bonifaz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8152702 filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ben Clements. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8152690 filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ronald A. Fein. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8152674 filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Debra L. Greenberger. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8152593 filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Vivake Prasad. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8152581 filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan S. Abady. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8152565 filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney O. Andrew F. Wilson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8152551 filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Brinckerhoff. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8152523 filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota.(Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 Declaration of Michelle Witte in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota.(Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Jaylani Hussein in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota.(Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration of Julia Dayton Klein in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5)(Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. (Klein, Julia)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Atlas Aegis LLC, Anthony Caudle, John Does #1-10. (KDS)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-2195 NEB/BRT. (KDS)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atlas Aegis LLC, Anthony Caudle, John Does #1-10 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8151568) filed by Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota, League of Women Voters of Minnesota. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klein, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota et al v. Atlas Aegis LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Caudle
Represented By: Terrance W Moore
Represented By: Carol R M Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Aegis LLC
Represented By: Terrance W Moore
Represented By: Carol R M Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: League of Women Voters of Minnesota
Represented By: Matthew Brinckerhoff
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: John C. Bonifaz
Represented By: O. Andrew F. Wilson
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Vivake Prasad
Represented By: Julia Dayton Klein
Represented By: Debra L Greenberger
Represented By: Jonathan S Abady
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Council on American - Islamic Relations - Minnesota
Represented By: Matthew Brinckerhoff
Represented By: Ben Clements
Represented By: John C. Bonifaz
Represented By: O. Andrew F. Wilson
Represented By: Ronald Fein
Represented By: Vivake Prasad
Represented By: Julia Dayton Klein
Represented By: Debra L Greenberger
Represented By: Jonathan S Abady
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Saint Paul
Represented By: Anthony G Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?