Haman v. Beltrami County et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Joseph Haman
Defendant: Beltrami County Sheriffs Office, Deputy Joseph Kleszyk, Deputy Charles Nelson, Beltrami County, City of Bemidji, Deputy Jason Riggs, Deputy Russell Platz, Deputy Anthony Petrie and Deputy Martin Gack
Case Number: 0:2020cv02277
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. See Order for specific deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/17/2020. (ALM)
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General , MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings #1 Complaint filed by Andrew Joseph Haman. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd by JME on 12/14/2020 (JME).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 BRIEFING ORDER re: #13 Motion to Dismiss/General. Plaintiff's Response due by 12/11/2020. Defendants' Reply due by 12/25/2020. No further briefing will be permitted without leave of Court. There will be no hearing unless the Court decides a hearing is necessary after reviewing the parties' papers. In addition, due to the pending motions to dismiss, the Court finds good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. The Court will issue a pretrial scheduling order, if needed, promptly after a final decision is issued on the pending motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/19/2020. (ALM)
November 18, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Bemidji re #14 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #18 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #15 Meet and Confer Statement, #16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #17 Affidavit in Support of Motion (Tsai, Evan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #13 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Tsai, Evan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Evan C. Tsai in SUPPORT OF #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City of Bemidji. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-6)(Tsai, Evan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City of Bemidji. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Tsai, Evan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by City of Bemidji.(Tsai, Evan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Tsai, Evan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City of Bemidji. (Tsai, Evan)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Bemidji re #11 Notice of Appearance (Tsai, Evan)
November 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Tsai on behalf of City of Bemidji. (Tsai, Evan)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEFING ORDER re: #4 Motion in Lieu of an Answer. Plaintiff's Response due by 12/4/2020. Defendants' Reply due by 12/18/2020. No further briefing will be permitted without leave of Court. There will be no hearing unless the Court decides a hearing is necessary after reviewing the parties' papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/12/2020.(JMK)
November 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (Attachment: Bowbeer Practice Pointers) (JMK)
November 11, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beltrami County, Beltrami County Sheriffs Office, Martin Gack, Joseph Kleszyk, Charles Nelson, Anthony Petrie, Russell Platz, Jason Riggs re #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Proposed Order to Judge, #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General , #5 Meet and Confer Statement (Wolf, Andrew)
November 11, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Beltrami County, Beltrami County Sheriffs Office, Martin Gack, Joseph Kleszyk, Charles Nelson, Anthony Petrie, Russell Platz, Jason Riggs.(Wolf, Andrew)
November 11, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Beltrami County, Beltrami County Sheriffs Office, Martin Gack, Joseph Kleszyk, Charles Nelson, Anthony Petrie, Russell Platz, Jason Riggs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wolf, Andrew)
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Beltrami County, Beltrami County Sheriffs Office, Martin Gack, Joseph Kleszyk, Charles Nelson, Anthony Petrie, Russell Platz, Jason Riggs.(Wolf, Andrew)
November 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Beltrami County, Beltrami County Sheriffs Office, Martin Gack, Joseph Kleszyk, Charles Nelson, Anthony Petrie, Russell Platz, Jason Riggs. (Wolf, Andrew)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-2277 JRT/HB. (CLK)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beltrami County, Beltrami County Sheriff Department, Martin Gack, Joseph Kleszyk, Charles Nelson, Anthony Petrie, Jason Riggs re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Wolf, Andrew)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beltrami County, case number 04-cv-20-2702 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8195139) filed by Joseph Kleszyk, Martin Gack, Anthony Petrie, Beltrami County, Jason Riggs, Beltrami County Sheriff Department, Charles Nelson. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) related state court documents, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wolf, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haman v. Beltrami County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beltrami County Sheriffs Office
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Joseph Kleszyk
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Charles Nelson
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beltrami County
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bemidji
Represented By: Evan Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Jason Riggs
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Russell Platz
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Anthony Petrie
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Martin Gack
Represented By: Jason M Hiveley
Represented By: Andrew A. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Joseph Haman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?