Miles v. Simmons University et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miles
Defendant: Kyle D. Killian and Simmons University
Case Number: 0:2020cv02333
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
2 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE: Remote Public Access available. A Motion Hearing is scheduled to be held on 1/19/2021 at 9:00 AM.If any member of the public would like to listen to the hearing, please dial (669) 254-5252. Use Meeting ID 160 910 3278 and Passcode 716542484. (RMM)
January 7, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Marshall on behalf of Kyle D. Killian. (Marshall, Andrew)
December 28, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Simmons University. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Somermeyer, Sean)
December 17, 2020 Filing 18 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Katherine Menendez. (KAT)
December 17, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 12/17/2020. See Minutes for details. (KAT)
December 14, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Mack H. Reed in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jennifer Miles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Reed, Mack)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jennifer Miles. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Reed, Mack)
December 14, 2020 Filing 14 Parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Simmons University, Jennifer Miles, and Kyle Killian. (Somermeyer, Sean) Modified text on 12/16/2020 (JME).
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Simmons University.(Somermeyer, Sean)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Simmons University.(Somermeyer, Sean)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Simmons University. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Somermeyer, Sean)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Somermeyer, Sean)
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Simmons University. (Somermeyer, Sean)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 11/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-2333 ECT/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/17/2020.(CLK)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) of Defendant Kyle D. Killian filed by Simmons University. (Somermeyer, Sean)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Simmons University re #2 Notice of Appearance, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Somermeyer, Sean)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-2333 ECT/DTS. (CLK)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Simmons University. (Somermeyer, Sean)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Somermeyer on behalf of Simmons University. (Somermeyer, Sean)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Goodhue County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8225283) filed by Simmons University. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Exhibit(s) B - Defendant Killian's Answer to Complaint, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Somermeyer, Sean) Modified text on 11/16/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles v. Simmons University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle D. Killian
Represented By: Andrew L Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simmons University
Represented By: Sean R. Somermeyer
Represented By: Raphael Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Miles
Represented By: Mack H Reed
Represented By: Cassandra B. Merrick
Represented By: Christopher W. Madel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?