United States of America v. Baez
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jose Baez
Case Number: 0:2020cv02388
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:4245
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL James E Ostgard, II for Jose Baez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 12/3/2020.(JLB)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER in Response to #7 Letter to Magistrate Judge. 1. The United States of America's letter request #7 is GRANTED; 2. The Office of the Federal Public Defender shall appoint counsel to represent the Respondent pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006A and 4247(d); and 3. The Federal Public Defender may review Respondent's medical and central files as part of its representation under 18 U.S.C. 4247(d) and 3006A. This order does not include any materials subject to the exemptions for disclosure of government records contained in the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. 552. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/30/2020.(JLB)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Letter to Magistrate Judge #7 Letter to Magistrate Judge. (Hochhalter, Quinn)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by United States of America . (Hochhalter, Quinn)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jose Baez. (kt)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-2388 DSD/LIB. (kt)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Petition (in a Civil Case), #2 Exhibit (Hochhalter, Quinn)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #2 Sealed Document(s) - Dkt. 2 Exhibit C to the Petition . (Hochhalter, Quinn)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 SEALED Exhibit C to the Petition re #1 Petition (in a Civil Case), by United States of America. (Hochhalter, Quinn) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (kt).
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION TO DETERMINE PRESENT MENTAL CONDITION OF AN IMPRISONED PERSON against Jose Baez filed by United States of America. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hochhalter, Quinn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Baez
Represented By: James E Ostgard, II
Represented By: Katherian D Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Quinn Hochhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?