Weisen v. Kohl's, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Defendant: DDRA Maple Grove Crossing LLC, Kohl's, Inc. d/b/a Kohl's and Kohl's Inc. doing business as Kohl's
Case Number: 0:2020cv02398
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #10 Notice of Settlement. This case is before the Court on the First Amended Notice of Settlement Requesting an Additional Thirty (30) Days to Finalize Agreement (Dkt. 10). Having considered the Request, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until and including February 8, 2021 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 1/11/2021.(TMA)
January 8, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE of Settlement Requesting an Additional 30 Days to Finalize Agreement by Jeffrey Weisen (Michenfelder, Patrick) Modified text on 1/11/2021 (kt).
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Jeffrey Weisen (Michenfelder, Patrick)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Defendant Kohls Inc. shall have until and including December 12, 2020 to respond to, or answer, Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/4/2020.(TMA)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Hutchinson, Troy)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Kohl's Inc.. Jointly Signed by Jeffrey Weisen. (Hutchinson, Troy)
November 27, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights Housing/Accomodations ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-2398 (ECT/ECW). (MMP)
November 27, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kohl's, Inc. d/b/a Kohl's re #3 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit/Exhibit List (Hutchinson, Troy)
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Kohl's, Inc. d/b/a Kohl's. (Hutchinson, Troy)
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT A Summons & Complaint-corrected re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Kohl's, Inc. d/b/a Kohl's. (Hutchinson, Troy)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8258785) filed by Kohl's, Inc. d/b/a Kohl's. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Ex. A Summons and Complaint, #2 Ex. B Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hutchinson, Troy) Modified text on 11/30/2020 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisen v. Kohl's, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDRA Maple Grove Crossing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's, Inc. d/b/a Kohl's
Represented By: Troy J Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Inc. doing business as Kohl's
Represented By: Troy J Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?